Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1148
RSS Feed Print
No. 16-1148
Title:Evergreen Partnering Group, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Pactiv Corporation, et al.
Docketed:March 22, 2017
Linked with 16A658
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1839)
   Decision Date:August 2, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:October 18, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 28 2016Application (16A658) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 16, 2017 to March 17, 2017, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Jan 05 2017Application (16A658) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until March 17, 2017.
Mar 17 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 21, 2017)
Mar 30 2017Waiver of right of respondent Pactiv Corporation to respond filed.
Mar 30 2017Waiver of right of respondent American Chemistry Council, Incorporated, an association to respond filed.
Mar 31 2017Waiver of right of respondents Dart Container Corp. and Solo Cup, Co. to respond filed.
Mar 31 2017Waiver of right of respondent Dolco Packaging, a Tekni-Plex Company to respond filed.
Apr 21 2017Brief amici curiae of Law Professors and Antitrust/Industrial Organization Scholars filed.
May 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 16 2017Response Requested. (Due June 15, 2017)
Jun 07 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 17, 2017.
Jul 17 2017Brief of respondents Pactiv Corporation, et al. in opposition filed.
Aug 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 14 2017Reply of petitioner Evergreen Partnering Group, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard Wolfram
    Counsel of Record
Richard Wolfram, Esq.
750 Third Avenue9th Floor
New York, NY 10012

rwolfram@rwolframlex.com
(917) 225-3050
Party name: Evergreen Partnering Group, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Steven M. Cowley
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris, LLP
100 High Street
Boston, MA 02110

smcowley@duanemorris.com
(857) 488-4261
Party name: Dolco Packaging, a Tekni-Plex Company
John P. Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Suite 500 West
Washington, DC 20037

jelwood@velaw.com
(202) 639-6500
Party name: Pactiv Corporation, et al.
William E. Lawler
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins, LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Suite #500, West
Washington, DC 20037-1701

wlawler@velaw.com
(202) 639-6679
Party name: Dart Container Corp. and Solo Cup, Co.
Ralph T. Lepore
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Knight LLP
10 St. James Avenue
Boston, MA 02116

(617)-523-2700
Party name: American Chemistry Council, Incorporated, an association
Richard A. Sawin Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Michienzie & Sawin, LLC
745 Boylston Street
Suite #501
Boston, MA 02116

rsawin@masatlaw.com
(617) 227-5660
Party name: Pactiv Corporation
Other
Peter D. St. Phillip Jr.Lowey, Dannenberg, Cohen & Hart, PC.
One N. Broadway, 5th Floor
White Plains, NY 10601

pstphillip@lowey.com
(914) 997-0500
Party name: Law Professors and Antitrust/Industrial Organization Scholars

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543