Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1147
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1147
Title:Donyelle Woods, Petitioner
v.
Willie Smith, Warden
Docketed:March 22, 2017
Linked with 16A790
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2339)
   Decision Date:August 25, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:November 17, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 02 2017Application (16A790) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 15, 2017 to March 17, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Feb 07 2017Application (16A790) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 17, 2017.
Mar 17 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 21, 2017)
Apr 17 2017Waiver of right of respondent Willie Smith, Warden to respond filed.
Apr 21 2017Brief amici curiae of Former Prosecutors filed.
Apr 21 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Innocence Network filed.
May 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017.
May 08 2017Response Requested. (Due June 7, 2017)
May 23 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 7, 2017.
Jul 07 2017Brief of respondent Willie Smith, Warden in opposition filed.
Jul 25 2017Reply of petitioner Donyelle Woods filed.
Jul 26 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Donyelle Woods
Attorneys for Respondent
Aaron D. Lindstrom
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

LindstromA@michigan.gov
(517) 373-1124
Party name: Willie Smith, Warden
Other
Ishan Kharshedji BhabhaJenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

ibhabha@jenner.com
202-637-6327
Party name: Former Prosecutors
Eric J. GormanSkadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP
155 North Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

eric.gorman@skadden.com
(312) 407-0700
Party name: The Innocence Network

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543