Docket for 16-1120
|
Mar 13 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2017) | | | Apr 12 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 17, 2017. | | | May 15 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including June 16, 2017. | | | Jun 16 2017 | Brief of respondent National Labor Relations Board in opposition filed. | | | Jul 05 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Sep 15 2017 | Reply of petitioner Con-Way Freight, Inc. filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|