Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1071
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1071
Title:Mark Sokolow, et al., Petitioners
v.
Palestine Liberation Organization, et al.
Docketed:March 7, 2017
Linked with 16A617
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3135-cv, 15-3151-cv)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:October 19, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 21 2016Application (16A617) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 17, 2017 to March 3, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Dec 29 2016Application (16A617) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until March 3, 2017.
Mar 03 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 6, 2017)
Mar 20 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 23, 2017.
Apr 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of U.S. House of Representatives filed.
Apr 06 2017Brief amici curiae of Former Federal Officials filed.
Apr 06 2017Brief amici curiae of United States Senators Charles E. Grassley, et al. filed.
Apr 06 2017Brief amici curiae of Restoring Religious Freedom Project at Emory University and JBAC, Inc. filed.
May 23 2017Brief of respondents Palestine Liberation Organization, et al. in opposition filed.
Jun 05 2017Reply of petitioners Mark Sokolow, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 26 2017The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Feb 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 12 2018Supplemental brief of petitioners Mark Sokolow, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 02 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Theodore B. Olson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

tolson@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8668
Party name: Mark Sokolow, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Gassan A. Baloul
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP
2550 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 20037

gassan.baloul@squirepb.com
(202) 457-6000
Party name: Palestine Liberation Organization, et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Adam Louis FotiadesZuckerman Spaeder, LLP
1800 M Street NW. 1000
Washington, DC 20036

afotiades@zuckerman.com
(202) 778-1800
Party name: Former Federal Officials
Thomas G. HungarOffice of General Counsel
219 Cannon House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

Thomas.Hungar@mail.house.gov
(202) 225-9700
Party name: U.S. House of Representatives
Richard D. KlinglerSidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

rklingler@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: United States Senators Charles E. Grassley, et al.
David I. Schoen2800 Zelda Road
Suite 100-6
Montgomery, AL 36106

dschoen593@aol.com
(334) 395-6611
Party name: Restoring Religious Freedom Project at Emory University and JBAC, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543