Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1027
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1027
Title:Ryan Austin Collins, Petitioner
v.
Virginia
Docketed:February 24, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(151277)
   Decision Date:September 15, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:November 22, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 27, 2017)
Mar 20 2017Waiver of right of respondent Virginia to respond filed.
Mar 27 2017Brief amici curiae of United States Justice Foundation, et al. filed.
Apr 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 12 2017Response Requested. (Due May 12, 2017)
Apr 24 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 12, 2017.
Jun 07 2017Brief of respondent Virginia in opposition filed.
Jun 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Jun 22 2017Reply of petitioner Ryan Austin Collins filed. (Distributed)
Sep 28 2017Petition GRANTED.
Nov 13 2017Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 13 2017Brief of petitioner Ryan A. Collins filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, January 9, 2018
Nov 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Restore the Fourth, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of The National Rifle Association Freedom Action Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of Fourth Amendment Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Motorcyclist Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amici curiae of Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2017CIRCULATED.
Dec 13 2017Brief of respondent Virginia filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 18 2017Record requested from the Supreme Court of Virginia.
Jan 02 2018Reply of petitioner Ryan A. Collins filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2018Record received from the Commonwealth of Virginia in the Circuit Court of the county of Albemarle. (1 Envelope).
Jan 05 2018Record received from the Court of Appeals of Virginia. (1 Envelope).
Jan 09 2018Argued. For petitioner: Matthew A. Fitzgerald, Richmond, Va. For respondent: Trevor S. Cox, Acting Solicitor General of Virginia, Richmond, Va.
Jan 17 2018Record received from the Supreme Court of Virginia is electronic.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew Allen Fitzgerald
    Counsel of Record
800 East Canal St.
Richmond, VA 23219

mfitzgerald@mcguirewoods.com
(804) 775-4716
Party name: Ryan A. Collins
Attorneys for Respondent
Trevor Stephen Cox
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

tcox@oag.state.va.us
(804) 786-7704
Party name: Virginia
Matthew Robert McGuireOffice of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

mmcguire@oag.state.va.us
804-786-7773
Party name: Virginia
Other
Anand Agneshwar
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
250 W. 55th St.
New York, NY 10019

anand.agneshwar@apks.com
212-836-8000
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
William Robert Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1000 Louisiana Street
Suite 4000
Houston, TX 77002

william.peterson@morganlewis.com
7138905188
Party name: American Motorcyclist Association
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The Cato Institute
Anthony Brian Sanders
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
520 Nicollet Mall
Suite 550
Minneapolis, MN 55402

asanders@ij.org
612-435-3451
Party name: Institute for Justice
Leslie A. Shoebotham
    Counsel of Record
Loyola University New Orleans College of Law
7214 St. Charles Avenue
Campus Box 901
New Orleans, LA 70118

shoeboth@loyno.edu
5048615683
Party name: Fourth Amendment Scholars
Mahesha Padmanabhan Subbaraman
    Counsel of Record
Subbaraman PLLC
222 S. 9th St., Suite 1600
Minneapolis, MN 55402

mps@subblaw.com
612-315-9210
Party name: Restore the Fourth, Inc.
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: The National Rifle Association Freedom Action Foundation
Herbert William Titus
    Counsel of Record
2400 Carolina Road
Cheasapeake, VA 23322

jmorgan@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al.
Robert Jeffrey OlsonWilliam J. Olson PC
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

wjo@mindspring.com
703-356-5070
Party name: United States Justice Foundation, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543