Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1017
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1017
Title:Laith G. Cox, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 24, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(16-0635/AR)
   Decision Date:January 17, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 27, 2017)
Mar 22 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 26, 2017.
Apr 19 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 15, 2017.
May 15 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
May 19 2017Reply of petitioner Laith G. Cox filed. VIDED.
Sep 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 28 2017Petition GRANTED, and the petitions for writs of certiorari in Nos. 16-961 and 16-1423 are granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. In addition to the questions presented by the petitions, the parties are directed to brief and argue the following question: Whether this Court has jurisdiction to review the cases in Nos. 16-961 and 16-1017 under 28 U. S. C. ยง 1259(3).
Nov 07 2017Joint appendix filed. VIDED. (Statement of costs filed)
Nov 07 2017Brief of petitioners filed. VIDED.
Nov 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of Aditya Bamzai in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Nov 17 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, January 16, 2018. VIDED
Nov 22 2017CIRCULATED.
Dec 07 2017Brief of respondent United States filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen I. Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

svladeck@law.utexas.edu
512-475-9198
Party name: Laith G.Cox
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543