Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1011
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1011
Title:WesternGeco LLC, Petitioner
v.
ION Geophysical Corporation
Docketed:February 17, 2017
Linked with 16A576
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2013-1527, 2014-1121, 2014-1526, 2014-1528)
   Decision Date:September 21, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 08 2016Application (16A576) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 20, 2016 to February 17, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Dec 13 2016Application (16A576) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 17, 2017.
Feb 17 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 20, 2017)
Mar 08 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 19, 2017.
Apr 19 2017Brief of respondent ION Geophysical Corporation in opposition filed.
May 08 2017Reply of petitioner WesternGeco LLC filed.
May 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 30 2017The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Dec 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Dec 20 2017Supplemental brief of respondent ION Geophysical Corp. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 12 2018Petition GRANTED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Jan 25 2018Letter of amendment to corporate disclosure statement from respondent ION Geophysical Corp. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 01 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, ION Geophysical Corporation.
Blanket Consent
Feb 02 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, WesternGeco LLC.
Blanket Consent
Feb 23 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 16, 2018.
Feb 23 2018Brief of petitioner WesternGeco LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2018Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of Law Professor Stephen Yelderman filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Power Integrations, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2018Brief amici curiae of Intellectual Property Law Scholars in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Houston Intellectual Property Law Association in Support of Neither Party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association filed in Support of Neither Party. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association filed in Support of Neither Party. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018CIRCULATED
Mar 09 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 26 2018Brief of respondent ION Geophysical Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2018Justice Alito is no longer recused in this case.
Mar 30 2018Record requested from U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit.
Apr 02 2018Brief amici curiae of Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., The Internet Association, SAS Institute Inc., Symmetry, LLC, and Xilinx, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation and R Street Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2018Record received from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of Texas Brownsville Division is electronic and can be accessed through the electronic case filing system for the Southern District of Texas. Sealed documents was sent to this Court, the record is electronic.
Apr 06 2018Record from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit is electronic and located on PACER, with the exception of 1 Box of Confidential material.
Apr 09 2018Reply of petitioner WesternGeco LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 16 2018Argued. For petitioner: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C.; and Zachary D. Tripp, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Kannon K. Shanmugam, Washington, D. C.
Jun 22 2018Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Thomas, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Ginsburg, Alito, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Gorsuch, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer, J., joined.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: WesternGeco LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202) 434-5000
Party name: ION Geophysical Corporation
Danielle J. HealeyFish & Richardson, P.C.
1221 McKinney Street
Suite 2800
Houston, TX 77010

healey@fr.com
713-654-5300
Party name: ION Geophysical Corp.
Other
Iftikhar Ahmed
    Counsel of Record
Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing, P.C.
1221 McKinney Street, Suite 2500
Houston, TX 77010

iftiahmed@azalaw.com
713-655-1101
Party name: Houston Intellectual Property Law Association
David Bartley Eppenauer
    Counsel of Record
Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.
701 Fifth Avenue
Suite 6800,
Seattle, WA 98104

beppenauer@shb.com
206-344-7600
Party name: Intellectual Property Owners Association
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Timothy R. Holbrook
    Counsel of Record
Emory University School of Law
1301 Clifton Rd, NE
Atlanta, GA 30322

tholbrook@emory.edu
404-712-0353
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Scholars
Rachel Clark Hughey
    Counsel of Record
Merchant & Gould P.C.
3200 IDS Center
80 South Eighth Street
Minneapolis, MN 55402

rhughey@merchantgould.com
612-332-5300
Party name: Law Professor Stephen Yelderman
David W. Long
    Counsel of Record
Essential Patent LLC
PO Box 710868
Oak Hill, VA 20171

longdw@essentialpatent.net
571-402-1922
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association
Daniel K. Nazer
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

daniel@eff.org
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation and R Street Institute
Irena Royzman
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

iroyzman@pbwt.com
(212) 336-2000
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association
Donald William Rupert
    Counsel of Record
MARSHALL, GERSTEIN & BORUN LLP
233 SOUTH WACKER DR.
6300 WILLIS TOWER
Chicago, IL 60606

drupert@marshallip.com
3124746300
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago
Alexandra Anastasia Ekaterina Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Shapiro Arato LLP
500 Fifth Avenue
40th Floor
New York, NY 10110

ashapiro@shapiroarato.com
212 257-4880
Party name: Power Integrations, Inc.
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., The Internet Association, SAS Institute Inc., Symmetry, LLC, and Xilinx, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543