Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15A773
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 15A773
Title:West Virginia, et al., Applicants
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:January 26, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1363)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 26 2016Application (15A773) for a stay pending consideration of petitions for review by the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jan 27 2016Response to application (15A773) requested by The Chief Justice, due Thursday, February 4, 2016, by 3 p.m. EST.
Feb 04 2016Response to application from respondent Environmental Protection Agency, et al. filed. VIDED.
Feb 04 2016Response to application from respondent NextEra Energy, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED.
Feb 04 2016Response to application from respondent New York, et al. filed. VIDED.
Feb 05 2016Reply of applicant West Virginia, et al. filed.
Feb 09 2016Application (15A773) referred to the Court.
Feb 09 2016Application (15A773) granted by the Court. The Environmental Protection Agency’s "Carbon Pollution Emission Guidelines for Existing Stationary Sources: Electric Utility Generating Units," 80 Fed. Reg. 64,662 (October 23, 2015), is stayed pending disposition of the applicants’ petitions for review in the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit and disposition of the applicants’ petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is sought. If a writ of certiorari is sought and the Court denies the petition, this order shall terminate automatically. If the Court grants the petition for a writ of certiorari, this order shall terminate when the Court enters its judgment. Justice Ginsburg, Justice Breyer, Justice Sotomayor, and Justice Kagan would deny the application.
Jul 27 2018Letter from Counsel for Environmental Defense Fund, et al. received.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of Attorney General
State Capitol
Building 1, Room E-26
Charleston, WV 25305

Elbert.Lin@wvago.gov
(304) 558-2021
Party name: West Virginia, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Barbara D. Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
NY State Office of the Attorney General
The Capitol
Albany, NY 12224

barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
(518) 776-2040
Party name: New York, et al.
Richard E Ayres
    Counsel of Record
Ayres Law Group
1707 L Street NW
Suite 850
Washington, DC 20036

(202) 452-9200
Party name: NextEra Energy, Inc., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543