Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-1498
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 15-1498
Title:Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General, Petitioner
v.
James Garcia Dimaya
Docketed:June 13, 2016
Linked with 15A1049
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(11-71307)
   Decision Date:October 19, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:January 25, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 13 2016Application (15A1049) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 24, 2016 to May 24, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Apr 24 2016Application (15A1049) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until May 24, 2016.
May 13 2016Application (15A1049) to extend further the time from May 24, 2016 to June 10, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
May 16 2016Application (15A1049) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until June 10, 2016.
Jun 10 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2016)
Jun 24 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 12, 2016.
Aug 12 2016Brief of respondent James Garcia Dimaya in opposition filed.
Aug 31 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Aug 31 2016Reply of petitioner Loretta E. Lynch, Attorney General filed. (Distributed)
Sep 29 2016Petition GRANTED.
Nov 07 2016Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Loretta E. Lynch, Attorney General.
Nov 14 2016Brief of petitioner Loretta E. Lynch, Attorney General filed.
Nov 28 2016Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Dec 05 2016SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, January 17, 2017.
Dec 07 2016Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Dec 12 2016CIRCULATED.
Dec 12 2016Record received from U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic.
Dec 14 2016Brief of respondent James Garcia Dimaya filed. (Distributed)
Dec 21 2016Brief amici curiae of Retired Article III Judges filed. (Distributed)
Dec 21 2016Brief amici curiae of National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of The National Immigration Law Center filed. (Distributed)
Dec 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Federal Defenders filed. (Distributed)
Jan 10 2017Reply of petitioner Loretta E. Lynch, Attorney General filed. (Distributed)
Jan 17 2017Argued. For petitioner: Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: E. Joshua Rosenkranz, New York, N. Y.
Jun 26 2017This case is restored to the calendar for reargument.
Jul 19 2017SET FOR REARGUMENT on Monday, October 2, 2017.
Aug 01 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Aug 03 2017Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic.
Oct 02 2017Argued. For petitioner: Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. For respondent: E. Joshua Rosenkranz, New York, N.Y.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Edwin S. KneedlerDeputy Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@usdoj.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Attorneys for Respondent
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019-6142

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
(212) 506-5380
Party name: James Garcia Dimaya
Other
Justin G. FlorenceRopes & Gray LLP
Prudential Tower
800 Boylston Street
Boston, MA 02199

justin.florence@ropesgray.com
(617) 951-7000
Party name: Retired Article III Judges
Kara HartzlerFederal Defenders of San Diego, Inc.
225 Broadway, Suite 900
San Diego, CA 92101-5008

kara_hartzler@fd.org
(619) 234-8467
Party name: The National Association of Federal Defenders
Andrew J. PincusMayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: The National Immigration Law Center
Sejal Ramnik ZotaNational Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild
14 Beacon Street, Suite 602
Boston, MA 02108

sejal@nipnlg.org
617-227-9727 X 108
Party name: National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543