Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-1496
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 15-1496
Title:Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General, Petitioner
v.
Manuel Jesus Lopez-Islava
Docketed:June 10, 2016
Linked with 15A1018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-71920)
   Decision Date:January 12, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 01 2016Application (15A1018) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 11, 2016 to May 11, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Apr 04 2016Application (15A1018) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until May 5, 2016.
Apr 25 2016Application (15A1018) to extend further the time from May 5, 2016 to June 10, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Apr 26 2016Application (15A1018) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until June 10, 2016.
Jun 10 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 11, 2016)
Jun 29 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 12, 2016.
Aug 12 2016Brief of respondent Manuel Jesus Lopez-Islava in opposition filed.
Aug 31 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Attorneys for Respondent
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019-6142

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
(212) 506-5380
Party name: Manuel Jesus Lopez-Islava

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543