Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-556
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 14-556
Vide 14-562, 14-571, 14-574
Title:James Obergefell, et al., Petitioners
v.
Richard Hodges, Director, Ohio Department of Health
Docketed:November 14, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-3057, 14-3464)
   Decision Date:November 6, 2014
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 14 2014Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2014)
Dec 08 2014Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondents.
Dec 12 2014Brief of respondent Richard Hodges, Director, Ohio Department of Health filed.
Dec 15 2014Brief amicus curiae of Idaho Governor C.L. "Butch" Otter filed. VIDED.
Dec 15 2014Brief amici curiae of Colage; Equality Federation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Dec 15 2014Brief amici curiae of 76 Scholars of Marriage filed. VIDED.
Dec 19 2014Letter from counsel for petitioners dated December 19, 2014, received waiving 14-day waiting period pursuant to Rule 15.5.
Dec 21 2014Reply of petitioners James Obergefell, et al. filed.
Dec 23 2014DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015.
Jan 12 2015DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 16, 2015.
Jan 16 2015Petition GRANTED The petitions for writs of certiorari in No. 14-562, No. 14-571, and No. 14-574 are granted. The cases are consolidated and the petitions for writs of certiorari are granted limited to the following questions: 1) Does the Fourteenth Amendment require a state to license a marriage between two people of the same sex? 2) Does the Fourteenth Amendment require a state to recognize a marriage between two people of the same sex when their marriage was lawfully licensed and performed out-of-state? A total of ninety minutes is allotted for oral argument on Question 1. A total of one hour is allotted for oral argument on Question 2. The parties are limited to filing briefs on the merits and presenting oral argument on the questions presented in their respective petitions. The briefs of petitioners are to be filed on or before 2 p.m., Friday, February 27, 2015. The briefs of respondents are to be filed on or before 2 p.m., Friday, March 27, 2015. The reply briefs are to be filed on or before 2 p.m., Friday, April 17, 2015. VIDED
Jan 26 2015Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents Steve Beshear, et al., in No. 14-574. VIDED
Jan 26 2015Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents Rick Snyder, Governor of Michigan, et al., in No. 14-571. VIDED
Feb 04 2015Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents Haslam, et al., in No. 14-562. VIDED
Feb 12 2015Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents Hodges, et al., in No. 14-556. VIDED
Feb 27 2015Joint appendix for No. 14-556, 14-562 & 14-574 filed (2 volumes). VIDED.
Feb 27 2015Brief of petitioners James Obergefell, et al. filed.
Feb 27 2015Brief amicus curiae of The County of Cuyahoga, Ohio filed.
Feb 27 2015Brief amici curiae of Mae Kuykendall, David Upham and Michael Worley in support of neither party and urging affirmance on question 1 filed. VIDED.
Mar 02 2015Brief amici curiae of Langley Hill Friends Meeting, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 03 2015Brief amicus curiae of Columbia Law School Sexuality and Gender Law Clinic filed. VIDED.
Mar 03 2015Brief amici curiae of Outserve-Servicemembers Legal Defense Network, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 03 2015Brief amicus curiae of Hawaii filed. VIDED.
Mar 03 2015Brief amicus curiae of Indiana University filed. VIDED.
Mar 03 2015Brief amicus curiae of BiLaw filed. VIDED.
Mar 04 2015Brief amici curiae of Services and Advocacy for Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Elders, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 04 2015Brief amicus curiae of The Cleveland Choral Arts Association Inc. a/k/a The North Coast Men's Chorus filed. VIDED.
Mar 04 2015Brief amici curiae of Elected Officials and Former Officeholders of Michigan, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 04 2015Brief amici curiae of Survivors of Sexual Orientation Change Therapies filed. VIDED.
Mar 04 2015Brief amici curiae of Equality Ohio, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 04 2015Brief amicus curiae of Professor W. Burlette Carter in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Mar 04 2015Brief amici curiae of California Council of Churches, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 05 2015Brief amici curiae of Conflict of Law Scholars filed. VIDED.
Mar 05 2015Brief amici curiae of Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 05 2015Brief amici curiae of Kenneth B. Mehlman, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 05 2015Brief amici curiae of National Women's Law Center, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 05 2015Brief amicus curiae of The American Humanist Association and Center for Inquiry filed. VIDED.
Mar 05 2015Brief amicus curiae of The Organization of American Historians filed. VIDED.
Mar 05 2015Brief amicus curiae of Citizens United for the Individual Freedom to Define Marriage in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Mar 05 2015Brief amici curiae of President of the House of Deputies of the Episcopal Church, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 05 2015Brief amici curiae of 379 Employers and Organizations Representing Employers filed. VIDED.
Mar 05 2015Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. VIDED.
Mar 05 2015Brief amicus curiae of The Alliance: State Advocates for Women's Rights and Gender Equality filed. VIDED.
Mar 05 2015Brief amici curiae of GLMA, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 05 2015Brief amicus curiae of American Sociological Association filed. VIDED.
Mar 05 2015Brief amicus curiae of Virginia filed. VIDED.
Mar 05 2015Brief amici curiae of Scholars of the Constitutional Rights of Children filed. VIDED.
Mar 05 2015Brief amicus curiae of National Family Civil Rights Center filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 06 2015SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, April 28, 2015
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of The Human Rights Campaign and 207,551 Americans filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Appendix of The Human Rights Campaign and 207,551 Americans filed. (10 Volumes) VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Kristin M. Perry, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of American Psychological Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Anti-Defamation League, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of PFLAG, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Conflict of Laws and Family Law Professors filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of The Donaldson Adoption Institute, et al. filed.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of The Liberty Education Forum filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of American Public Health Association, and Whitman-Walker Health filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Lawrence J. Korb, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of 167 Members of the U.S. House of Representatives, and 44 U.S. Senators filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Law Enforcement Officers, First Responders, and Organizations filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of Legal Services NYC filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars Stephen Clark, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Family Law Scholars filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of Freedom to Marry filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of Americans United for Separation of Church and State filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of John K. Olson filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of Marriage Equality USA filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of LGBT Student Organizations at Undergraduate, Graduate, and Professional Schools filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of Minnesota filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of Garden State Equality filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of 226 U.S. Mayors, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of The Mattachine Society of Washington, D.C. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of The General Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists, et al. in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Professors Laurence H. Tribe and Michael C. Dorf filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Campaign for Southern Equality and Equality Federation filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Proposal to lodge excerpts of original, declassified documents, from counsel for amicus curiae The Mattachine Society of Washington D.C. VIDE
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Douglas Laycock, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Human Rights Watch and The New York City Bar Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Historians of Marriage and the American Historical Association filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Ninety-Two Plaintiffs in Marriage Cases in Alabama, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of Gary J. Gates filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Foreign and Comparative Law Experts Harold Hongju Koh, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars Ashutosh Bhagwat, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Carlos A. Ball, Distinguished Professor of Law, Rutgers University, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Family Equality Council, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amicus curiae of Experiential Learning Lab at New York University School of Law filed. VIDED.
Mar 06 2015Brief amici curiae of Chris Kluwe, et al. filed.
Mar 16 2015CIRCULATED.
Mar 17 2015Record requested from U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Mar 17 2015Joint letter of argument proposal from counsel for the petitioners. VIDED
Mar 17 2015Joint letter of argument proposal from counsel for the respondents. VIDED
Mar 17 2015Brief amicus curiae of Robert J. Bentley, Governor of Alabama filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 18 2015Record received from U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit is electronic.
Mar 18 2015Record from U.S.D.C. Southern Dist. of Ohio is electronic and located on PACER.
Mar 26 2015Brief amicus curiae of Dr. Paul McHugh filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 26 2015Brief amicus curiae of Professor Daniel N. Robinson, Ph.D. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 27 2015Brief of respondents Richard Hodges, Director, Ohio Department of Health, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 27 2015Brief amici curiae of Scholars of History and Related Disciplines filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 27 2015Brief amicus curiae of Ryan T. Anderson, Ph.D. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 27 2015Brief amici curiae of Dawn Stefanowicz and Denise Shick filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 27 2015Brief amici curiae of Heather Barwick and Katy Faust filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 27 2015Brief amicus curiae of State of South Carolina filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 27 2015Brief amici curiae of Robert Oscar Lopez and B.N. Klein filed. VIDED.(Distributed)
Mar 30 2015Brief amici curiae of 54 International and Comparative Law Experts from 27 Countries filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 30 2015Brief amicus curiae of Family Trust Foundation of Kentucky, Inc., A/K/A The Family Foundation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 30 2015Brief amici curiae of The Ruth Institute and Dr. Jennifer Roback Morse, Ph.D. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 30 2015Brief amici curiae of North Carolina Values Coalition, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 31 2015Supplemental joint letter of argument proposal from counsel for the petitioners. VIDED
Mar 31 2015Brief amicus curiae of Family Research Council filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 31 2015Brief amicus curiae of Lary S. Larson filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 31 2015Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org Education Fund filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 31 2015Brief amici curiae of Organizations That Promote Biological Parenting filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Mar 31 2015Brief amici curiae of Liberty Scholars and the Saint Thomas More Society of Dallas filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 01 2015Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Originalism filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 01 2015Brief amicus curiae of Parents and Friends of Gays & Ex-Gays filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 01 2015Brief amici curiae of Wyoming Legislators and Scholars of Full Faith and Credit filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 01 2015Brief amicus curiae of David A. Robinson filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 01 2015Brief amicus curiae of Public Affairs Campaign and Opinion Expert Frank Schubert, et al. filed. VIDED.
Apr 01 2015Brief amicus curiae of Algirdas M. Liepas filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 01 2015Brief amicus curiae of National Coalition of Black Pastors and Christian Leaders filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 02 2015Brief amici curiae of American College of Pediatricians, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 02 2015Brief amicus curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 02 2015Brief amici curiae of 100 Scholars of Marriage filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 02 2015Brief amicus curiae of Tri Valley Law, P.C. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 02 2015Brief amici curiae of Organizations and Scholars of Gender-Diverse Parenting filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 02 2015Brief amicus curiae of Catholic Answers filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 02 2015Brief amici curiae of 47 Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 02 2015Brief amici curiae of Scholars of the Welfare of Women, Children, and Underprivileged Populations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 02 2015Brief amici curiae of Major Religious Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 02 2015Brief amici curiae of Leaders of the 2012 Republican National Convention Committee on the Platform, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 02 2015Brief amici curiae of Religious Organizations, Public Speakers, and Scholars Concerned About Free Speech filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 02 2015Brief amicus curiae of The Committee for Justice filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 02 2015Brief amici curiae of Louisiana, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 02 2015Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Theodore Coates. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Upon consideration of the March 17 and March 31, 2015, letters from counsel for the petitioners and the respondents, the following order of argument is adopted. On Question 1 the time is allocated as follows: 30 minutes for one advocate on behalf of the petitioners, 15 minutes for the Solicitor General, and 45 minutes for one advocate on behalf of the respondents. On Question 2 the time is allocated as follows: 30 minutes for one advocate on behalf of the petitioners, and 30 minutes for one advocate on behalf of the respondents. VIDED
Apr 03 2015Brief amici curiae of Texas Eagle Forum and Steven F. Hotze, M.D. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Fertility and Marriage filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amicus curiae of Richard A. Lawrence filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amici curiae of Mike Huckabee Policy Solutions and, Family Research Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amici curiae of Public Advocate of the U.S., et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amicus curiae of State of Alabama filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amicus curiae Idaho Governor C.L. "Butch" Otter filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amici curiae of Earl M. Maltz, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amici curiae of Jason Feliciano and Seventeen Pastors filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amicus curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amicus curiae of International Conference of Evangelical Endorsers filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amicus curiae of Lighted Candle Society filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amicus curiae of Concerned Women for America filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amici curiae of Institute for Marriage and Public Policy, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amici curiae of ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amici curiae of 57 Members of U.S. Congress filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amicus curiae of Jon Simmons filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amicus curiae of Texas Values filed. VIDED.(Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amici curiae of Dr. Judith Reisman, and Liberty Center for Child Protection filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amici curiae of Same-Sex Attracted Men and their Wives filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 03 2015Brief amicus curiae of Agudath Israel of America filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 17 2015Reply of petitioners James Obergefell, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Apr 28 2015Argued. For petitioners on Question 1: Mary L. Bonauto, Boston, Mass.; and Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents on Question 1: John J. Bursch, Special Assistant Attorney General, Lansing, Mich. For petitioners on Question 2: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier, Washington, D. C. For respondents on Question 2: Joseph F. Whalen, Associate Solicitor General, Nashville, Tenn.
May 04 2015Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Theodore Coates DENIED. VIDED.
May 21 2015Request for recusal received from amicus curiae Foundation for Moral Law. VIDED
Jun 26 2015Judgment REVERSED. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Ginsburg, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Roberts, C. J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Scalia and Thomas, JJ., joined. Scalia, J. filed a dissenting opinion, in which Thomas, J., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Scalia, J., joined. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Scalia and Thomas, JJ., joined. VIDED
Jul 28 2015JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alphonse A. Gerhardstein
    Counsel of Record
Gerhardstein & Branch Co. LPA
432 Walnut St., Suite 400
Cincinnati, OH 45202

agerhardstein@gbfirm.com
(513) 621-0779
Party name: James Obergefell, et al.
Mary L. BonautoGay & Lesbian Advocates & Defenders
30 Winter Street
Suite 800
Boston, MA 02108

mbonauto@glad.com
(617) 426-1350
Party name: James Obergefell, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Eric E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
State Solicitor
Office of the Ohio Attorney's General
30 East Broad Street, 17th Fl.
Columbus, OH 43215-3428

eric.murphy@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
(614) 466-8980
Party name: Richard Hodges, Director, Ohio Department of Health, et al.
Other
Algert S. Agricola Jr.Ryals, Donaldson & Agricola, P.C.
60 Commerce Street, Suite 1400
Montgomery, AL 36104

aagricola@rdafirm.com
(334) 834-5290
Party name: Robert J. Bentley, Governor of Alabama
Cristina AlonsoCarlton, Fields, Jorden, Burt, P.A.
100 Southeast Second Street, Suite 4200
Miami, FL 33131

calonso@cfjblaw.com
(305)-530-0050
Party name: Campaign for Southren Equality and Equality Federation
J. Scott BallengerLatham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

scott.ballenger@lw.com
(202) 637-2200
Party name: Gary J.Gates
Richard D. BernsteinWillkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
1875 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

rbernstein@willkie.com
(202) 303-1100
Party name: Ninety-Two Plaintiffs in Marriage Cases in Alabama, et al.
Boris BershteynSkadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
4 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

boris.bershteyn@skadden.com
(212) 735-3000
Party name: American Health Association, and Whitman -Walker
Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr.Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

cboccuzzi@cgsh.com
(212) 225-2000
Party name: American Sociological Association
Blithe Smith BockCity Attorney of the City Los Angeles
200 North Main Street
600 City Hall East
Los Angeles, CA 90012

blithe.bock@lacity.org
(213) 978-2205
Party name: 226 U.S. Mayors, et al.
James Bopp Jr.The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
(812) 232-2434
Party name: Leaders of the 2012 Republican National Convention Committee on the Platform, et al.
Ruth N. BorensteinMorrison & Foerster LLP
425 Market Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

RBorenstein@mofo.com
(415) 268-7000
Party name: Foreign and Comparative Law Experts Harold Honju Koh, et al.
David C. BoyleP.O. Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734)-904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
Gerard V. Bradley3156 Eck Hall of Law
Notre Dame, IN 46556

gerard.v.bradley.16@nd.edu
(574)-631-8385
Party name: Dr. Paul McHugh
Andrew L. BrasherSolicitor General
Office of Attorney General
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130

abrasher@ago.state.al.us
(334) 353-2609
Party name: State of Alabama
Dean R. BroylesNational Center for Law & Policy
539 West Grand Avenue
Escondido, CA 92025

dbroyles@nclplaw.org
(760)-747-4529
Party name: Parents and Friends of Gays & Ex-Gays
G. Eric Brunstad Jr.Dechert LLP
90 State House Square
Hartford, CT 06103

eric.brunstad@dechert.com
(860) 524-3999
Party name: John K. Olson
Martin N. BuchananLaw Offices of Martin N. Buchanan
655 West Broadway, Suite 1700
San Diego, CA 92101

martin@martinbuchanan.com
(619) 238-2426
Party name: Marriage Equality USA
John J. BurschSpecial Assistant Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

MIAG@michigan.gov
(517) 373-1110
Party name: James Obergefell, et al. v. Richard Hodges, Director, Ohio Department of Health, et al.
Douglas J. Callahan242 W. Caroline Street
Fenton, MI 48430-0000

doug.callahan@nfcrc.org
(800) 385-0601
Party name: National Family Civil Rights Center
Jacob Daniel CampionOffice of the Attorney General
445 Minnesota Street, Suite 1100
Saint Paul, MN 55101-2128

jacob.campion@ag.state.mn.us
651-757-1459
Party name: Minnesota
Daniel J. CanonClay Daniel Walton Adams, PLC
101 Meidinger Tower
462 South 4th Street, Suite 101
Louisville, KY 40202

dan@justiceky.com
(502) 561-2005 x216
Party name: Bourke, et al.
Hunter Thompson CarterArent Fox, LLP
1675 Broadway, 34th Floor
New York, NY 10019

hunter.carter@arentfox.com
(212) 484-3900
Party name: Law Enforcement Officers, First Responders and Organizations
Willieta Burlette CarterGeorge Washington University Law School
2000 H Street, NW
Washington, DC 20052

bcarter@law.gwu.edu
202 994-5155
Party name: Professor W. Burlette Carter
Stanton L. CaveP.O. Box 910457
Lexington, KY 40591-0457

stan.cave@stancavelaw.com
(859) 309-3000
Party name: Family Trust Foundation of Kentucky, Inc., A/K/A The Family Foundation
Theodore Coates5994 South Holly Street
Suite 158
Greenwood Village, CO 80111

coates0603@msn.com
(720) 393-8646
Party name: Theodore Coates
Sean J. Coletti428 Park Avenue
ldaho Falls, ID 83402

seancoletti@hopkinsroden.com
208-523-4445
Party name: Lary S. Larson
Teresa Stanton CollettUniversity of St. Thomas School of Law
MSL 400
1000 LaSalle Avenue
Minneapolis, MN 55403-2015

tscollett@stthomas.edu
(651) 962-4973
Party name: Institute for Marriage and Public Policy, et al.
Robert D. CookSolicitor General
P.O. Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29202-1549

BCook@scag.gov
(803) 734-3970
Party name: State of South Carolina
Charles J. CooperCooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
(202) 220-9600
Party name: Scholars of History and Related Disciplines
Andrew J. DavisFolger Levin LLP
199 Fremont Street, 20th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

ddavis@folgerlevin.com
(415)-625-1050
Party name: PFLAG, Inc,
Peggy Cooper DavisNew York University School of Law
40 Washington Square South
New York, NY 10012

davisp@mercury.law.nyu.edu
(212) 998-6465
Party name: Experiential Learning Lab at New York University School of Law
Walter DellingerO'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

wdellinger@omm.com
(202) 383-5319
Party name: Freedom to Marry
Deborah Dewart620 E. Sabiston Drive
Swansboro, NC 28584-9674

debcpalaw@earthlink.net
(910)-326-4554
Party name: North Carolina Values Coalition, et al.
Gregory L. DiskantPatterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

gldiskant@pbwt.com
(212) 336-2000
Party name: Elected Officials and Former Officeholders of Michigan, et al.
Herbert K. Doby215 East 21st Avenue
PO Box 130
Torrington, WY 82240

nhibben@dobyhidden.com
(307) 532-2700
Party name: Wyoming Legislators and Scholars of Full Faith and Credit
John A. DragsethFish & Richardson P.C.
3200 RBC Plaza
60 South 6th Street
Minneapolis, MN 55402

dragseth@fr.com
(612) 335-5070
Party name: Chris Kluwe, et al.
S. Kyle DuncanSchaerr | Duncan LLP
1717 K Street, NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

kduncan@schaerr-duncan.com
(202) 714-9492; (202) 787-1060
Party name: Louisiana, et al.
William C. DuncanMarriage Law Foundation
1868 N 800 E
Lehi, UT 84043

duncanw@marriagelawfoundation.org
(801)-367-4570
Party name: Scholars of Originalism
Alexander Dushku1800 World Trade Center
60 East South Temple Suite 1800
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

adushku@kmclaw.com
(801) 328-3600
Party name: Major Religious Organizations
John C. EastmanCenter for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Chapman University School of Law
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
(714) 628-2666
Party name: Public Affairs Campaign and Opinion Expert Frank Schubert, et al.
John A. EidsmoeFoundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
(334) 262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Craig EngleArent Fox Kintner Plotkin & Kahn
1717 K Street
Washington, DC 20036-5339

craig.engle@arentfox.com
(202) 857-6000
Party name: The Liberty Education Forum
William N. Eskridge Jr.Yale Law School
PO Box 208215
New Haven, CT 06520

william.eskridge@yale.edu
(203)-432-9056
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.
Steven W. FitschenThe National Legal Foundation
2224 Virginia Beach Blvd.
Suite 204
Virginia Beach, VA 23454

nlf@nlf.net
(757)-463-6133
Party name: Concerned Women for America
Marjory Anne GentryThree Embarcadero Center
10th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

Marjory.Gentry@aporter.com
415-471-3365
Party name: Conflict of Laws and Family Law Professors
Robert P. GeorgeRobinson & McElwee
500 Virginia Street East, Suite 400
Charleston, WV 25326

rgeorge@princeton.edu
(609) 258-3270
Party name: 47 Scholars
Sandra F. Gilbert3020 Garland Ave.
Plymouth , MN 55447

SandyFGilbert@msn.com
(612) 715-5049
Party name: Jason Feliciano and Seventeen Pastors
Patrick T. GillenAve Maria School of Law
1025 Commons Circle
Naples, FL 34119

ptgillen@avemarialaw.edu
(734) 355-4728
Party name: CatholicVote.org Education Fund
Shannon Lee GoesslingSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
2255 Sewell Mill Rd., Suite 320
Marietta, GA 30062

shannon@southeasternlegal.org
(770) 977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Suzanne B. GoldbergColumbia Law School
Sexuality and Gender Law Center
435 West 116th Street
New York, NY 10027

sgoldb1@law.columbia.edu
(212) 854-0411
Party name: Columbia Law School Sexuality and Gender Law Clinic
Kevin E. Green456 N. Meridian Street, #1517
Indianapolis, IN 46204

keglegal@aol.com
(317) 437-5002
Party name: Jon Simmons
Marc A. GreendorferTri Valley Law PC
2410 Camino Ramon
Suite 122
San Ramon, CA 94583

marc@trivalleylaw.com
(925) 328-0128
Party name: Tri Valley Law, P.C.
Herbert G. Grey4800 S.W. Griffth Drive, Suite 320
Beaverton, OR 97005

herb@greylaw.org
(503) 641-4908
Party name: Earl M. Maltz, et al.
Joseph R. GuerraSidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

jguerra@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: Lawrence J. Korb, et al.
Paul J. HallDLA Piper LLP (US)
555 Mission Street, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94105-2933

paul.hall@dlapiper.com
(415) 836-2500
Party name: Carlos A. Ball, Distinguished Professor of Law, Rutgers University, et al.
Douglas Hallward-DriemeierRopes & Gray LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Ave., NW, Suite 1200
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
(202) 508-4776
Party name: Tanco, et al.
Elizabeth L. HilemanHileman & Associates, P.C.
7979 Old Georgetown Rd., Suite 600
Bethesda, MD 20814

ehileman@hilemanlaw.com
(301) 652-1448
Party name: The American Humanist Association and Center for Inquiry
Matthew Michael HoffmanGoodwin Procter LLP
901 New York Avenue N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

mhoffman@goodwinprocter.com
(202)-346-4000
Party name: Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights, et al.
Eric A. IsaacsonRobbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
655 West Broadway, Suite 1900
San Diego, CA 92101

erici@rgrdlaw.com
(619) 231-1058
Party name: California Council of Churches, et al.
Darrin K. JohnsLaw Firm of Darrin K. Johns PC
12 West ,100 North Suite-F
American Fork, UT 84003

darrin.johns@darrinjohnslaw.com
(801) 228-7521
Party name: Same-Sex Attracted Men and their Wives
Lawrence J. Joseph1250 Connecticut Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20036

lj@larryjoseph.com
(202) 355-9452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund in support of neither party
Roberta A. KaplanPaul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019-6064

rkaplan@paulweiss.com
(212) 373-3000
Party name: The Human Rights Campaign and 207, 551 Americans
Harlan Daniel Karp850 Euclid Ave., #1330
Cleveland, OH 44114

harlankarp@gmail.com
(216) 685-1360
Party name: The Cleveland Choral Arts Association Inc. a/k/a The North Coast Men's Chorus
Meir KatzThe Berkman Law Office
111 Livingston Street
Suite1928
Brooklyn, NY 11201

mkatz@berkmanlaw.com
(718) 855-3627
Party name: The Committee for Justice
Katherine KeatingBryan Cave LLP
Three Embarcadero Center, 7th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111-4070

katherine.keating@bryancave.com
(415) 268-1972
Party name: Family Equality Council, et al.
Mae KuykendallMichigan State University
648 N. Shaw Lane Rm. 366
East Lansing, MI 48824

kuykend1@law.msu.edu
(517) 432-6894
Party name: Mae Kuykendall, David Upham and Michael Worley
Sharee S. LangensteinP.O. Box 141
Murphysboro, IL 62966

shareelangenstein@yahoo.com
(855) 694-8671
Party name: The Ruth Institute and Dr. Jennifer Roback Morse, Ph.D.
Jon LaramoreFaegre Baker Daniels
300 N. Meridian St., Suite 2700
Indianapolis, IN 46204

jon.laramore@faegrebd.com
(317) 237-0300
Party name: Indiana University
Leigh Gross LatherowVanAntwerp, Monge, Jones, Edwards & McCann, LLP
P.O. Box 1111
Ashland, KY 41105

llatherow@vmje.com
(606) 329-2929
Party name: Beshear, et al.
Girard D. LauDeputy Attorney General
Department of the Attorney General
425 Queen Street
Honolulu, HI 96813

girard.d.lau@hawaii.gov
(808) 586-1360
Party name: Hawaii
Richard A. Lawrence608 South Hull Street
Montgomery, AL 36104

richard@rlawrencelaw.com
(334) 263-2000
Party name: Richard A. Lawrence
Douglas LaycockUniversity of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

dlaycock@virginia.edu
(434) 243-8546
Party name: Douglas Laycock, et al.
Richard L. LevineWeil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP
767 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10153

richard.levine@weil.com
(212) 310-8286
Party name: Human Rights Watch and The New York City Bar Association, et al.
Algirdas M. Liepas4025 Automation Way, Suite C4 North
Fort Collins, CO 80525

algirdas@liepas.com
970-493-3359
Party name: Algirdas M. Liepas
David S. LillLill FirmPC
4407 Bee Caves Road
Suite 111, Building 1
Austin, TX 78746

david@lillfirm.com
(512) 330-0252
Party name: Texas Values
Charles S. LimandriFreedom of Conscience Defense Fund
PO Box 9520
Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067

cslimandri@limandri.com
(858) 759-9948
Party name: Catholic Answers
Aaron D. LindstromSolicitor General
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

LindstromA@michigan.gov
(517) 373-1124
Party name: Snyder, et al.
Paul Benjamin LintonSpecial Counsel
Thomas More Society
921 Keystone Avenue
Northbrook, IL 60062

PBLCONLAW@AOL.COM
(847) 291-3848
Party name: Family Research Council
Larry S. LoigmanP.O. Box 97
Middletown, NJ 07748

loigman@verizon.net
(732) 539-0550
Party name: Agudath Israel of America
Joseph Patrick LombardoChapman and Cutler, LLP
111 W. Monroe Street
Chicago, IL 60603

lombardo@chapman.com
312-845-3428
Party name: Legal Scholars Stephen Clark, et al.
Robert A. Long Jr.Covington & Burling LLP
One City Center
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004-2401

rlong@cov.com
(202) 662-6000
Party name: Conflict of Law Scholars
Lawrence S. LustbergGibbons P.C.
One Gateway Center
Newark, NJ 07102-5310

llustberg@gibbonslaw.com
(973) 596-4500
Party name: Garden State Equality
Majeed G. MakhloufCuyahoga County Department of Law
2079 East 9th St., 7th Fl.
Cleveland, OH 44115

mmakhlouf@cuyahogacounty.us
(216) 698-6464
Party name: The County of Cuyahoga, Ohio
Christopher D. ManChadbourne & Parke LLP
1200 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

cman@chadbourne.com
(202) 974-5600
Party name: Outserve-Servicemembers Legal Defense Network, et al.
Susan Leann Baker ManningMorgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
2020 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

susan.manning@morganlewis.com
(202) 373-6000
Party name: 379 Employers and Organizations Representing Employers
Emily J. MartinNational Women's Law Center
11 Dupont Circle, NW, Suite 800
Washington, DC 20036

emartin@nwlc.org
(202)-588-5180
Party name: National Women's Law Center, et al.
Lori Alvino McGillQuinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
777 6th Street, NW
11th Floor
Washington, DC 20001-3706

lorialvinomcgill@quinnemanuel.com
(202) 538-8000
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars Ashutosh Bhagwat, et al.
Robert J. McNamara901 N Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

rmcnamara@ij.org
(703)-682-9320
Party name: Institute for Justice
J. E. McNeilMcNeil & Ricks, PC
4119 Garrison St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20016

jmcnrick@yahoo.com
(202) 256-7441
Party name: Langley Hill Friends Meeting, et al.
Andrew MelzerSanford Heisler Kimpel, LLP
1350 Avenue of the Americas 31st Floor
New York, NY 10019

amelzer@sanfordheisler.com
(646) 402-5657
Party name: LGBT Student Organizations at Undergraduate, Graduate and Professional Schools
Jonathan B. MillerOffice of the Attorney General
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

jonathan.miller@state.ma.us
(617) 727-2200
Party name: Massachusetts, et al.
Alan B. MorrisonGeorge Washington University Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
(202) 994-5157
Party name: Equality Ohio, et al.
Jonathan Jacob NadlerSquire Patton Boggs (US) LLP
2550 M Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jack.nadler@squirepb.com
(202) 457-6016
Party name: Services and Advocacy for Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Elders, et al.
Alice M. O'BrienNational Education Association
1201 16th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

aobrien@nea.org
(202) 822-7035
Party name: American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
Nicholas M. O'DonnellSullivan & Worcester LLP
One Post Office Square
Boston, MA 02109

nodonnell@sandw.com
(617)-338-28
Party name: GLMA
Theodore B. OlsonGibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-5306

tolson@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Kristin M. Perry, et al.
William J. OlsonWilliam J.Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

wjo@mindspring.com
(703) 356-5070
Party name: Public Advocate of the U.S., et al.
Gregory E. OstfeldGreenberg Traurig LLP
77 W. Wacker Drive
Suite 3100
Chicago, IL 60601

ostfeld@gtlaw.com
(312)-476-5056
Party name: Anti-Defamation League, et al.
Kathleen M. O'SullivanPerkins Coie, LLP
1201 Third Avenue, 48th Floor
Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101-3099

kosullivan@perkinscoie.com
(206) 359-8000
Party name: The AllIance: State Advocates for Woman's Rights and Gender Equality
Owen C. PellWhite & Case, LLP
1155 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

opell@whitecase.com
(212) 819-8200
Party name: Legal Services NYC
James F. PetersonJudicial Watch, Inc
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

jpeterson@judicialwatch.org
(202) 646-5172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc.
Anthony R. Picarello Jr.U.S. Conference of Catholic Bishops
3211 Fourth Street, N.E.
Washington, DC 20017

apicarello@usccb.org
(202) 541-3300
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops
Andrew P. Pugno8261 Greenback Lane Suite 200
Fair Oaks, CA 95628-2533

andrew@pugnolaw.com
916 608-3065
Party name: ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, et al.
Stuart A. RaphaelSolicitor General of Virginia
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

sraphael@oag.state.va.us
(804) 786-7240
Party name: Virginia
Eric C. RassbachBecket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave., Ste. 700
Washington, DC 20036

erassbach@becketfund.org
(202) 955-0095
Party name: The General Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists, et al.
David A. RobinsonP.O. Box 780
North Haven, CT 06473

david@davidalanrobinson.com
(203) 214-4078
Party name: David A. Robinson
Sanford Jay RosenRosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld, LLP
50 Fremont Street
Nineteenth Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104-1823

srosen@rbgg.com
(415) 433-6830
Party name: Survivors of Sexual Orientation Change Therapies
E. Joshua RosenkranzOrrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019-6142

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
(212) 506-5380
Party name: Family Law Scholars
Jerome C. RothMunger, Tolles & Olson, LLP
560 Mission Street, 27th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94105

jerome.roth@mto.com
(415) 512-4000
Party name: Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom, et al.
Charles A. RothfeldMayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3233
Party name: Americans United for Separation of Curch and State
D. John SauerJames Otis Law Group LLC
12977 N. Forty Drive, Suite 214
St. Louis, MO 63141

jsauer@jamesotis.com
(314) 682-6067
Party name: 57 Members of U.S. Congress
Gene C. SchaerrSchaerr l Duncan, LLP
1717 K Street, NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-duncan.com
(202) 787-1060
Party name: Idaho Governor C.L. "Butch" Otter
Gene Clayton SchaerrSchaerr Law Group
332 Constitution Avenue NE
Washington, DC 20002

gschaerr@gmail.com
(202)-361-1061
Party name: 76 Scholars of Marriage
Andrew L. Schlafly939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
(908) 719-8608
Party name: Texas Eagle Forum and Steven F. Hotze, M.D.
John Paul Schnapper-CasterasNAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund
1444 I Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

jschnapper@naacpldf.org
(202) 682-1300
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al.
Arthur A. Schulcz Sr.Chaplains' Counsel PLLC
21043 Honeycreeper PL.
Leesburg, VA 20175

art@chaplainscounsel.com
(703) 645-4010
Party name: International Conference of Evangelical Endorsers
Kelly J. ShackelfordLiberty Institute
2001 W. Plano Parkway, Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackford@libertyinstitute.org
(972) 941-4444
Party name: Religious Organizations, Public Speakers, and Scholars Concerned About Free Speech
Pratik A. ShahAkin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
1333 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

pshah@akingump.com
(202) 887-4000
Party name: Historians of Marriage, and the American Historical Association
Benjamin G. ShatzManatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
11355 West Olympic Boulevard
Los Angles, CA 90064-1632

bshatz@manatt.com
(310) 312-4000
Party name: Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic
Catherine E. Smith2255 E. Evans Ave.
Denver, CO 80208

c.smith@law.du.edu
(303) 871-6180
Party name: Scholars of the Constitutional Rights of Children
Michael F. SmithThe Smith Appellate Law Firm
1717 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 1025
Washington, DC 20006

smith@smithpllc.com
(202) 454-2860
Party name: Ryan T. Anderson, Ph.D.
Paul M. SmithCampaign Legal Center
1411 K Street NW
Suite 1400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
(202) 736-2200
Party name: American Psychological Association, et al.
Kevin T. SniderPacific Justice Institute
P.O. Box 276600
Sacramento , CA 95827

ksnider@pji.org
(916) 857-6900
Party name: Professor Daniel N. Robinson, Ph.D.
Carole M. Stanyar221 N. Main Street
Suite 300
Ann Arbor, MI 48104

cstanyar@wowway.com
(313) 819-3953
Party name: DeBoer, et al.
Mathew D. StaverLiberty Counsel
P.O. Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

court@lc.org
(800) 671-1776
Party name: Dr. Judith Reisman, and Liberty Center for Child Protection
Catherine E. StetsonHogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
(202) 637-5491
Party name: The Organization of American Historians
D'Arcy Winston Straub6772 W. Ida Dr. #327
Littleton, CO 80123

darcystraub@gmail.com
303-794-4109
Party name: Citizens United for the Individual Freedom to Define Marriage
Timothy N. TardibonoFamily Policy Institute of Oklahoma
P.O. Box 1097
Family Policy Institute of Oklahoma P.O. Box 1097
Bethany, OK 73008

info@okfamily.org
(405) 664-6514
Party name: Organizations That Promote Biological Parenting
James R TateTate, Bywater, Fuller, Mickelsen & Tull, PLC
2740 Chain Bridge Rd.
Vienna, VA 22181

jtate@tatebywater.com
(703) 938-5100
Party name: Scholars of Fertility and Marriage
Paul M. ThompsonMcDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

pthompson@mwe.com
(202) 756-8000
Party name: The Mattachine Society of Washington, D.C.
Richard ThompsonThomas More Law Center
24 Frank Lloyd Wright Drive
P.O. Box 393
Ann Arbor, MI 48106

rthompson@thomasmore.org
(734) 827-2001
Party name: National Coalition of Black Pastors and Christian Leaders
Aaron Michael TidmanMintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popper PC
701 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

amtidman@mintz.com
(202) 434-7300
Party name: The Donaldson Adoption Institute, et al.
Jeffrey S. TrachtmanKramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel, LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

jtrachtman@kramerlevin.com
(212) 715-9100
Party name: President of the House of Deputies of the Episcopal Church, et al.
Edward H. Trent550 W. Main Avenue, Suite 900
Knoxville, TN 37902

etrent@wimberlylawson.com
(865) 546-1000
Party name: Organizations and Scholars of Gender-diverse Parenting
Joseph F. TringaliSimpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

jtringali@stblaw.com
(212) 455-2000
Party name: 167 Members of the U.S. House of Representatives, and 44 U.S. Senators
David R. UphamUniversity of Dallas
1845 East Northgaate Drive
Irving, TX 75062-4736

davidrupham@yahoo.com
(972) 721-5186
Party name: Liberty Scholars and the Saint Thomas More Society of Dallas
Kyle Courtenay VelteUniversity of Denver Sturm College of Law
2255 E. Evans Ave., Room 365L
Denver, CO 80208

kyle.velte@gmail.com
(720) 648-9266
Party name: BiLaw
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: United States
Brian Christopher VertzPollock Begg Komar Glasser & Vertz, LLC
437 Grant Street, Suite 501
Pittsburgh, PA 15219

bvertz@pollockbegg.com
(412) 471-9000
Party name: American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers, et al.
David C. Walker2000 S. Colorado Blvd.
Tower 2, Suite 700
Denver, CO 80222

dwalker@bbdfirm.com
303-329-3363
Party name: American College of Pediatricians, et al.
James J. WalshBODMAN PLC
1901 St. Antoine Street
Detroit, MI 48226

jwalsh@bodmanlaw.com
(313) 259-7777
Party name: Michigan Catholic Conference
Lynn D. WardleJ. Reuben Clark Law School
452 JRCB
Provo, UT 84602

wardlel@law.byu.edu
(801) 422-6842
Party name: 54 International and Comparative Law Experts from 27 Countries
Seth P. WaxmanWilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: Kenneth B. Mehlman, et al.
George M. WeaverHollberg & Weaver, LLP
2921 Piedmont Road, N. E.
Suite C
Atlanta, GA 30305

gweaver@hw-law.com
(404) 760-1116
Party name: Lighted Candle Society
Joseph F. WhalenAssociate Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
500 Charlotte Avenue
Nashville, TN 37243

joe.whalen@ag.tn.gov
(615) 741-3499
Party name: Haslam, et al.
Jeffrey S. WittenbrinkRowe Law Firm, L.L.C.
5157 Bluebonnet Blvd.
Baton Rouge, LA 70809

(225) 293-8787
Party name: Mike Huckabee Policy Solutions and, Family Research Institute
Christopher J. WrightHarris Wiltshire & Grannis LLP
1919 M Street NW
Eighth Floor
Washington, DC 20036

cwright@hwglaw.com
(202) 730-1300
Party name: Professors Laurence H. Tribe and Michael C. Dorf
Elizabeth B. WydraConstitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th St., N.W., Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

elizabeth@theusconstitution.org
(202) 296-6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543