SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-910
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-910
Title:
Ivan Antonyuk, et al., Petitioners
v.
Steven G. James, In His Official Capacity as Acting Superintendent of New York State Police, et al.
Docketed:
February 22, 2024
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(22-2908, 22-2972, 22-2933, 22-2987, 22-3237)
Decision Date:
December 8, 2023
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 20 2024
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2024)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 26 2024
Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2024 to May 9, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 27 2024
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 9, 2024, for all respondents.
Mar 22 2024
Brief amicus curiae of New York State Sheriffs' Association, Inc. filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2024
Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2024
Brief amici curiae of Second Amendment Law Center, et al. filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2024
Brief amici curiae of Peace Officers Research Association of California, et al. filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2024
Brief amicus curiae of National Rifle Association of America filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2024
Brief amicus curiae of Project 21 filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert Jeffrey Olson
Counsel of Record
William J. Olson P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615
rob@wjopc.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Ivan Antonyuk, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Todd Michael Long
Counsel of Record
Senior Corporation Counsel
Office of the Corporation Counsel, City of Syracuse, New York
233 East Washington Street, 300 City Hall
Syracuse, NY 13202
tlong@syr.gov
315-448-8400
Party name: Joseph Cecile
Barbara Dale Underwood
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400
BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV
212-416-8016
Party name: Steven G. James and Matthew J. Doran
Other
John Allen Eidsmoe
Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104
eidsmoeja@juno.com
3342621245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Erin Marie Erhardt
Counsel of Record
National Rifle Assocation of America
11250 Waples Mill Road
Fairfax, VA 22030
eerhardt@nrahq.org
7032671161
Party name: National Rifle Association of America
David Emilio Mastagni Jr.
Counsel of Record
Mastagni Holstedt, A.P.C.
1912 I St.
Sacramento, CA 95811
davidm@mastagni.com
(916) 491-4289
Party name: Peach Officers Research Association of California, et al.
C. D. Michel
Counsel of Record
Michel & Associates, P.C.
180 East Ocean Blvd.
Suite 200
Long Beach, CA 90802
CMICHEL@MICHELLAWYERS.COM
(562) 216-4444
Party name: Second Amendment Law Center, California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Gun Owners Of California, Federal Firearms Licensees Of Illinois, Second Amendment Defense And Education Coalition, And Operation Blazing Sword-Pink Pistols
Thomas A. Mitchell
Counsel of Record
27 Elk Street
Albany, NY 12207
tmitchellnyssa@gmail.com
5184417353
Party name: New York State Sheriffs' Association, Inc
David Christian Tryon
Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street
Columbus, OH 43215
d.tryon@buckeyeinstitute.org
6142244422
Party name: Project 21
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##