Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-1207
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-1207
Title:Assassination Archives and Research Center, et al., Petitioners
v.
Central Intelligence Agency
Docketed:May 10, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-5064)
   Decision Date:December 7, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:February 8, 2024
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 08 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 10, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2024Waiver of right of respondent Central Intelligence Agency to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 04 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Daniel S. Alcorn
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
1335 Ballantrae Lane
McLean, VA 22101

dalcorn@rcn.com
703-442-0704
Party name: Assassination Archives and Research Center, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Central Intelligence Agency

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543