Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-1021
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-1021
Title:Kari Lake, et al., Petitioners
v.
Adrian Fontes, Arizona Secretary of State, et al.
Docketed:March 18, 2024
Linked with 23A622
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-16413)
   Decision Date:October 16, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2024Application (23A622) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 14, 2024 to February 15, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Jan 05 2024Application (23A622) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 15, 2024.
Feb 01 2024Application (23A622) to extend further the time from February 15, 2024 to March 14, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Written Request
Feb 05 2024Application (23A622) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 14, 2024.
Mar 14 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2024)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2024Motion to expedite considerarion filed by petitioner Kari Lake, et al.
Main DocumentOther
Mar 27 2024Waiver of right of respondent Pima County Board of Supervisors to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 27 2024Waiver of right of respondent Arizona Secretary of State Adrian Fontes to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 27 2024Waiver of right of respondents Maricopa County Board of Supervisors, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 02 2024Supplemental Brief of Kari Lake, et al. not accepted for filing. (April 03, 2024)
Apr 03 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024.
Apr 09 2024Amicus brief of Georgia Republican Party, Inc. not accepted for filing. (April 11, 2024)
Apr 11 2024Brief amici curiae of Georgia Republican Party, Inc.,et al. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

LJOSEPH@LARRYJOSEPH.COM
2023559452
Party name: Kari Lake, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Daniel S. Jurkowitz
    Counsel of Record
Pima Cnty. Attorney's Office
32 N. Stone #2100
Tucson, AZ 85701

daniel.jurkowitz@pcao.pima.gov
5207245700
Party name: Pima County Board of Supervisors
Kara Marie Karlson
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General's Office
2005 N. Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

kara.karlson@azag.gov
6025428118
Party name: Arizona Secretary of State Adrian Fontes
Thomas Purcell Liddy
    Counsel of Record
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
225 West Madison St.
Phoenix, AZ 85003

liddyt@mcao.maricopa.gov
602.506.3411
Party name: Maricopa County Board of Supervisors, et al.
Other
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

WJO@MINDSPRING.COM
7033565070
Party name: Georgia Republican Party, Inc., Republican Party of Arizona, LLC, and Republican State Committee of Delaware

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543