Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-1020
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-1020
Title:Utah, Petitioner
v.
Alfonso Valdez
Docketed:March 18, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Utah
   Case Numbers:(20210175)
   Decision Date:December 14, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 13 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 17, 2024 to May 17, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 28 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 17, 2024.
Apr 17 2024Brief amici curiae of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2024Brief of respondent Alfonso Valdez in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 31 2024Reply of petitioner Utah filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stanford Edward Purser
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street
Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114

SPURSER@AGUTAH.GOV
801-538-9600
Party name: State of Utah
Attorneys for Respondent
Lisa S. Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

LBLATT@WC.COM
202-434-5050
Party name: Alfonso Valdez
Other
James Allen Barta
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
302 W. Washington Street
IGC South, Fifth Floor
Indianapolis, IN 46204

james.barta@atg.in.gov
317-232-0709
Party name: States of Indiana, Alabama, Alaska, Delaware, Iowa, Kansas, Louisiana, Maine, Michigan, Mississippi, Nebraska, North Dakota, Ohio, Oregon, South Carolina, South Dakota, and Texas

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543