Docket for 22-6585
|
Jan 17 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 21, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix | Jan 30 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Bill Lee, Governor of Tennessee to respond filed. | | Main Document | Feb 01 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Rebekah Barnes to respond filed. | | Main Document | Feb 09 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/24/2023. | | | Feb 27 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|