Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-52
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-52
Title:Ariyan Incorporated, dba Discount Corner, et al., Petitioners
v.
Sewerage & Water Board of New Orleans, et al.
Docketed:July 20, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-30335)
   Decision Date:March 21, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:April 19, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 19, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
Jul 20 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Ariyan, Incorporated, dba Discount Corner, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 21 2022Waiver of right of respondent Sewerage & Water Board of New Orleans, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 22 2022Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 27 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Aug 04 2022Supplemental brief of petitioners Ariyan, Incorporated, dba Discount Corner, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 09 2022Response Requested. (Due September 8, 2022)
Aug 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Owners' Counsel of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 08 2022Brief amici curiae of Reason Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2022Brief of respondents Sewerage & Water Board of New Orleans, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2022Reply of petitioners Ariyan, Incorporated, dba Discount Corner, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/14/2022.
Oct 17 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert H. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall
Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

rthomas@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Ariyan, Incorporated, dba Discount Corner, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Alex Benjamin Rothenberg
    Counsel of Record
Gordon, Arata, Montgomery, Barnett
201 St. Charles Ave., Floor 40
New Orleans, LA 70170

arothenberg@gamb.com
504-679-9826
Party name: Sewerage & Water Board of New Orleans, et al.
Other
Michael M. Berger
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
2049 Century Park East
Suite 1700
Los Angeles, CA 90067

mmberger@manatt.com
(310) 312-4185
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Stephen Sharp Davis
    Counsel of Record
True North Law LLC
112 S. Hanley Road
Suite 200
St. Louis, MO 63105

sdavis@truenorthlawgroup.com
(314) 296-4000
Party name: Reason Foundation, Southeastern Legal Foundation, National Association of Reversionary Property Owners, and Professor James W. Ely, Jr.
Mark M. Murakami
    Counsel of Record
Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert
1003 Bishop Street
1600 Pauahi Tower
Honolulu, HI 96813

mmm@hawaiilawyer.com
808-531-8031
Party name: Owners' Counsel of America
Clark M. Neily III
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

cneily@cato.org
202-842-0200
Party name: Cato Institute
Jeffrey Hallett Redfern
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

jredfern@ij.org
6123081084
Party name: Institute for Justice

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543