Docket for 22-502
|
Nov 28 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 30, 2022) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 14 2022 | Waiver of right of respondents Nathan Aaron Forrest, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 11 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023. | | | Jan 17 2023 | Response Requested. (Due February 16, 2023) | | | Feb 14 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2023 to March 20, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 15 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 20, 2023. | | | Mar 15 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 20, 2023 to April 19, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 16 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 19, 2023. | | |
|