Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-367
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-367
Title:Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, Petitioner
v.
Cooperative de Ahorro y Credito Abraham Rosa, et al.
Docketed:October 19, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1119)
   Decision Date:July 18, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 17 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 18, 2022)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Nov 03 2022Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from November 18, 2022 to December 19, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 04 2022Motion of Oscar Adolfo Mandry-Aparicio, et al. to extend the time to file a response from November 18, 2022 to December 19, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 07 2022The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including December 19, 2022, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Martin J. Bienenstock
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

mbienenstock@proskauer.com
(212) 969-3000
Party name: Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Attorneys for Respondents
Russell A. Del Toro
    Counsel of Record
Russell A. Del Toro Sosa Law Office
2 Calle Washington Apt. 304
San Juan, PR 00907

rdeltoro@dtslaw.com
7875296502
Party name: PFZ Properties, Inc.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Robert H. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Ste 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

rthomas@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Oscar Adolfo Mandry-Aparicio, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543