Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-305
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-305
Title:Kevin O'Rourke, et al., Petitioners
v.
Dominion Voting Systems, Inc., et al.
Docketed:September 29, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1161)
   Decision Date:May 27, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:June 27, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 26 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 31, 2022)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 15 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/2/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ernest J. Walker
    Counsel of Record
Ernest J. Walker Law Offices
3368 Riverside Rd.
Benton Harbor, MI 49022

ernestjwalker@gmail.com
3039954835
Party name: Kevin O'Rourke, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543