Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-25
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-25
Title:Roy Lynn McCutchen, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:July 8, 2022
Linked with 21A586
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1188)
   Decision Date:October 1, 2021
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:February 2, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 04 2022Application (21A585) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 3, 2022 to July 2, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Apr 04 2022Application (21A586) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 3, 2022 to July 2, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 07 2022Application (21A585) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 2, 2022.
Apr 12 2022Application (21A586) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 2, 2022.
Jul 05 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 8, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 11 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Roy Lynn McCutchen, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 20 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 8, 2022 to September 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 7, 2022.
Jul 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 7, 2022 to October 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 7, 2022.
Aug 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of Maryland Shall Issue, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 08 2022Brief amici curiae of Montana and 16 other States filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Patrick Strawbridge
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
Ten Post Office Square
8th Floor South PMB #706
Boston, MA 02109

patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
2075223163
Party name: Roy Lynn McCutchen, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
David Morgan Steven Dewhirst
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Solicitor General
P.O. Box 201401
215 North Sanders
Helena, MT 59620-1401

David.Dewhirst@mt.gov
406-444-2026
Party name: State of Montana and 16 other States
Mark William Pennak
    Counsel of Record
Maryland Shall Issue, Inc.
9613 Harford Rd., Ste. C #1015
Baltimore, MD, MD 21234

m.pennak@me.com
301 873 3671
Party name: Maryland Shall Issue, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543