Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-788
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-788
Title:Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc., dba Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles, Petitioner
v.
City of Los Angeles, California, et al.
Docketed:November 29, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-56251)
   Decision Date:August 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 29, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2021Waiver of right of respondent City of Los Angeles to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 15 2021Waiver of right of respondent Alliance of Californians for Community Empowermet Action and Strategic Actions for a Just Economy to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of California Apartment Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 28 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Foundation for Moral Law.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of California Association of Realtors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 10 2022Response Requested. (Due February 9, 2022)
Jan 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 9, 2022 to April 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 12 2022Response to motion from petitioner Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles filed.
Main Document
Jan 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2022, for all respondents.
Jan 14 2022Motion of City of Los Angeles to extend the time to file a response from February 9, 2022 to April 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 14 2022Response to motion from petitioner Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles filed.
Main Document
Jan 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2022, for all respondents.
Mar 11 2022Brief of respondent Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action and Strategic Actions for a Just Economy in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2022Brief of respondent City of Los Angeles in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 24 2022Reply of petitioner Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 08 2022Supplemental brief of petitioner Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 18 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Foundation for Moral Law GRANTED.
Apr 18 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Douglas J. Dennington
    Counsel of Record
Rutan & Tucker LLP
18575 Jamboree Road, 9th Floor
Irvine, CA 92612

ddennington@rutan.com
(714) 641-5100
Party name: Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles
Attorneys for Respondents
Kathryn Ann Eidmann
    Counsel of Record
Public Counsel
610 S. Ardmore Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90005

keidmann@publiccounsel.org
2133852977
Party name: Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action and Strategic Actions for a Just Economy
Jonathan H Eisenman
    Counsel of Record
Los Angeles City Attorney's Office
200 N. Spring Street, 14th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90012

Jonathan.Eisenman@lacity.org
(213) 978-2212
Party name: City of Los Angeles
Blithe Smith BockOffice of the City Attorney for the City of Los An
200 No. Spring Street, 14th floor
Los Angeles, CA 90012

blithe.bock@lacity.org
(213) 978-2205
Party name: City of Los Angeles
Rohit D NathSusman Godfrey L.L.P.
1900 Avenue of the Stars
Suite 1400
Los Angeles, CA 90067

rnath@susmangodfrey.com
310-789-3100
Party name: Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action and Strategic Actions for a Just Economy
Other
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36064

eidsmoeja@juno.com
(334) 262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Jared Alan McClain
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

jmcclain@ij.org
8563050034
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Christopher Elliott Skinnell
    Counsel of Record
Nielsen Merksamer Parrinello Gross and Leoni, LLP
2350 Kerner Blvd. Suite 250
Suite 250
San Rafael, CA 94901

cskinnell@nmgovlaw.com
4153896800
Party name: California Apartment Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543