Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-417
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-417
Title:Sulzer Mixpac AG, Petitioner
v.
A&N Trading Company, et al.
Docketed:September 16, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2951)
   Decision Date:February 18, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:May 6, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 18, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of the International Trademark Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Intellectual Property Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2021Brief amici curiae of International Anticounterfeiting Coalition, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service
Oct 21 2021Letter of petitioner Sulzer Mixpac AG pertaining to Rule 29.6 filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 02 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/19/2021.
Nov 08 2021Response Requested. (Due December 8, 2021)
Dec 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 8, 2021 to January 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 7, 2022.
Jan 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 7, 2022 to February 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 7, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Sulzer Mixpac AG
Attorneys for Respondents
Jack A. Gordon
    Counsel of Record
Kent, Beatty & Gordon, LLP
11 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

jag@kbg-law.com
(212) 421-4300
Party name: A&N Trading Company, et al.
Other
Jason Patrick Bloom
    Counsel of Record
Haynes and Boone, LLP
2323 Victory Ave.
Suite 700
Dallas, TX 75219

jason.bloom@haynesboone.com
2142083181
Party name: The International Trademark Association
Theodore H. Davis Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
1100 Peachtree Street
Suite 2800
Atlanta, GA 30309-4530

tdavis@kilpatricktownsend.com
4048156534
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Professors
Jamaica Potts Szeliga
    Counsel of Record
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
975 F Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

jszeliga@seyfarth.com
2028285364
Party name: International Anticounterfeiting Coalition, Industrial Designers Society of America, Inc. and Swissmem

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543