Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1511
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1511
Title:Joy Garner, Individually and on Behalf of The Control Group, et al., Petitioners
v.
Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States
Docketed:June 2, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-15587)
   Decision Date:February 28, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 27 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 5, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 05 2022Waiver of right of respondent Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 05 2022Brief amicus curiae of Children's Health Defense filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 05 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Foundation for Moral Law.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 05 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Institute for Health Research.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Institute for Health Research GRANTED.
Oct 03 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Foundation for Moral Law GRANTED.
Oct 03 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory James Glaser
    Counsel of Record
Greg Glaser, Attorney at Law
4399 Buckboard Drive #423
Copperopolis, CA 95228

greg@gregglaser.com
9256426651
Party name: Joy Garner, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States
Other
Lowell H. Becraft Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Lowell H. Becraft, Jr.
403C Andrew Jackson Way
Huntsville, AL 35801

becraft@hiwaay.net
2565332535
Party name: Institute for Health Research
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
(334) 262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Mary Holland
    Counsel of Record
Children's Health Defense
752 Franklin Ave., Suite 511
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417

mary.holland@childrenshealthdefense.org
2028541310
Party name: Children's Health Defense

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543