May 12 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 15, 2022) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jun 09 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent Kathleen A. McCallister to respond filed. |
| Main Document |
Jun 17 2022 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Central District Consumer Bankruptcy Attorneys Association. |
| Main DocumentMain DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jun 22 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. |
| |
Aug 02 2022 | Response Requested. (Due September 1, 2022) |
| |
Sep 01 2022 | Brief of respondent Kathleen A. McCallister in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Sep 20 2022 | Reply of petitioner Dustin Jade Wells filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Sep 21 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022. |
| |
Oct 11 2022 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. |
| |
Mar 29 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count |
Apr 12 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/28/2023. |
| |
Apr 12 2023 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Dustin Jade Wells filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
May 01 2023 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Central District Consumer Bankruptcy Attorneys Association GRANTED. |
| |
May 01 2023 | Petition DENIED. |
| |