Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A96
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A96
Title:Danville Christian Academy, Inc., et al., Applicants
v.
Andy Beshear, Governor of Kentucky
Docketed:December 1, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-6341)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 01 2020Application (20A96) to vacate stay, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 01 2020Response to application (20A96) requested by Justice Kavanaugh, due Friday, December 4, by 4 p.m. ET.
Dec 02 2020Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of Pleasant View Baptist Church, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 03 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 04 2020Response to application from respondent Andy Beshear, Governor of Kentucky filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 04 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Bourbon Christian Academy, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 04 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by United States Senators.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 04 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Samuel A. Fryer Yavneh Academy, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 04 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Church-State Scholars.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Dec 08 2020Reply of applicants Danville Christian Academy, Inc., et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The American Medical Association, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 17 2020Application (20A96) referred to the Court.
Dec 17 2020Application (20A96) denied by the Court. (Detached Opinion). JUSTICE ALITO, with whom JUSTICE GORSUCH joins, dissenting from the denial of application to vacate stay. JUSTICE GORSUCH, with whom JUSTICE ALITO joins, dissenting from the denial of application to vacate stay. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Barry Lee Dunn
    Counsel of Record
Kentucky Office of the Attorney General
700 Capital Avenue
Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

barry.dunn@ky.gov
502.696.5653
Party name: Danville Christian Academy, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Amy Denise Cubbage
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Governor, Commonwealth of Kentucky
700 Capitol Avenue
Frankfort, KY 40601

amy.cubbage@ky.gov
5025642611
Party name: Andy Beshear, Governor of Kentucky
Other
Thomas B. Bruns
    Counsel of Record
Bruns, Connell, Vollmar & Armstrong, LLC
4750 Ashwood Drive, Suite 200
Cincinnati, OH 45241

tbruns@bcvalaw.com
513-312-9890
Party name: Pleasant View Baptist Church, et al.
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

erassbach@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Gordon Dwyer Todd
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

gtodd@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: Samuel A. Fryer Yavneh Academy, Montebello Christian School, and Saint Joseph Academy
John Matthew Gore
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

jmgore@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: 38 United States Senators
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Multiple Private Kentucky Religious Schools
Joseph Russell Palmore
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

jpalmore@mofo.com
202-887-6940
Party name: Church-State Scholars
Leonard A. Nelson
    Counsel of Record
American Medical Association
330 N. Wabash Ave.
Suite 39300
Chicago, IL 60611

leonard.nelson@ama-assn.org
3124645532
Party name: The American Medical Association and the Louisville Metro Department of Public Health and Wellness in Support of Respondent

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543