Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-641
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-641
Title:LSP Transmission Holdings, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Katie Sieben, et al.
Docketed:November 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2559)
   Decision Date:March 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 8, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 10, 2020 to January 25, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 25, 2021, for all respondents.
Nov 24 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, LSP Transmission Holdings, LLC
Blanket Consent
Dec 10 2020Amicus brief of Resale Power Group of Iowa, Coalition of MISO Transmission Consumers, Industrial Energy Consumers of America, and the American Forest & Paper Association not accepted for filing. (December 10, 2020)
Dec 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Resale Power Group of Iowa, Coalition of MISO Transmission Consumers, Industrial Energy Consumers of America, and the American Forest & Paper Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Former FERC Chairman Jon B. Wellinghoff filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: LSP Transmission Holdings, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth Catherine Kramer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Minnesota Attorney General
445 Minnesota Street
Suite 1100
Saint Paul, MN 55101

liz.kramer@ag.state.mn.us
6517571010
Party name: Katie Sieben, et al.
Other
Kirk Howard Betts
    Counsel of Record
Betts & Holt LLP
1101 Connecticut Ave., NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

kbetts@bettsandholt.com
202-530-3388
Party name: Resale Power Group of Iowa, Coalition of MISO Transmission Consumers, Industrial Energy Consumers of America, and the American Forest & Paper Association
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3300
Party name: Former FERC Chairman Jon B. Wellinghoff

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543