Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1425
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1425
Title:C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Allen Miller
Docketed:April 12, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15981)
   Decision Date:September 28, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 9, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2021Waiver of right of respondent Allen Miller to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 13 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Apr 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
Apr 19 2021Response Requested. (Due May 19, 2021)
Apr 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 19, 2021 to June 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 18, 2021.
May 19 2021Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Transportation Intermediaries Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 19 2021Brief amici curiae of Leading Industry Freight Brokers (Armstrong Transport Group, Llc, Choptank Transport, Inc., Coyote Logistics, Llc, Echo Global Logistics, Inc., England Logistics, Inc., Globaltranz Enterprises, Llc, Mode Global, Llc, Total Quality Logistics, Llc, Transpla filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of DRI–The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Interested Freight Motor Carriers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 16 2021Brief of respondent Allen Miller in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 18 2021Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from June, 30, 2021 to July 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 22 2021Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until July 7, 2021 granted.
Jul 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Jul 07 2021Reply of petitioner C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Rena Mara Leizerman
    Counsel of Record
The Law Firm for Truck Safety
3450 W Central Ave Suite 328
Toledo, OH 43606

rena@truckaccidents.com
419-243-1010
Party name: Allen Miller
Andrew Ralph YoungThe Law Firm for Truck Safety
31387 Lorain Rd.
North Olsted, OH 44070

andy@truckaccidents.com
216-789-4832
Party name: Allen Miller
Other
Richard D. Gluck
    Counsel of Record
Foster Garvey PC
1000 Potomac Street, N.W.
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20007

richard.gluck@foster.com
(202) 965-7880
Party name: Transportation Intermediaries Association, Inc.
Ronald Michael Jacobs
    Counsel of Record
Venable LLP
600 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

rmjacobs@venable.com
2023448215
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Mary Massaron
    Counsel of Record
Plunkett & Cooney, P.C.
38505 Woodward Ave
Suite 100
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

mmassaron@plunkettcooney.com
313-983-4801
Party name: DRI–The Voice of the Defense Bar
Robert Daniel Moseley Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Moseley Marcinak Law Group LLP
4324 Wade Hampton Boulevard, Suite B
Taylors, SC 29687

rob.moseley@momarlaw.com
(864) 248-6026
Party name: Interested Freight Motor Carriers
Jason Orleans
    Counsel of Record
Orleans Canty Novy LLC
65 East Wacker Place, Suite 1220
Chicago, IL 60601

JOrleans@OCNLaw.com
8476258200
Party name: Leading Industry Freight Brokers (Armstrong Transport Group, Llc, Choptank Transport, Inc., Coyote Logistics, Llc, Echo Global Logistics, Inc., England Logistics, Inc., Globaltranz Enterprises, Llc, Mode Global, Llc, Total Quality Logistics, Llc, Transplace Texas, Lp And Uber Freight Llc

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543