Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1263
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1263
Title:Gianinna Gallardo, an Incapacitated Person, By and Through her Parents and Co-Guardians Pilar Vassallo and Walter Gallardo, Petitioner
v.
Simone Marstiller, In Her Official Capacity as Secretary of the Florida Agency for Health Care Administration
Docketed:March 11, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-13693)
   Decision Date:June 26, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 20, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 12, 2021 to May 27, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 27, 2021.
May 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 27, 2021 to July 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 20 2021Response to motion from petitioner Gianinna Gallardo filed.
Main Document
May 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including June 1, 2021.
May 25 2021Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2021Response to petition from respondent Simone Marstiller filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jun 07 2021Reply of petitioner Gianinna Gallardo filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Bryan S. Gowdy
    Counsel of Record
Creed & Gowdy, P.A.
865 May Street
Jacksonville, FL 32204

bgowdy@appellate-firm.com
9043500075
Party name: Gianinna Gallardo
Attorneys for Respondent
James Hamilton Percival II
    Counsel of Record
Florida Attorney General's Office
PL-01, The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32312

james.percival@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3684
Party name: Simone Marstiller

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543