Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1088
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1088
Title:David Carson, as Parent and Next Friend of O. C., et al., Petitioners
v.
A. Pender Makin
Docketed:February 9, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1746)
   Decision Date:October 29, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 11, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, David Carson, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 09 2021Brief amici curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation and yes. every kid. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 09 2021Waiver of right of respondent A. Pender Makin to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition of Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Brief amici curiae of Council of Islamic Schools in North America, Partnership for Inner-City Education, and Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Brief amici curiae of Innovative Schools filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Brief amici curiae of National Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of EdChoice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Brief amici curiae of Liberty Justice Center,et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Arkansas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Mar 22 2021Response Requested. (Due April 21, 2021)
Mar 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 21, 2021 to May 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 21, 2021.
Apr 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 21 2021Brief of respondent A. Pender Makin in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 03 2021Reply of petitioners David Carson, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2021Supplemental brief of petitioners David Carson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.
Jul 02 2021Petition GRANTED.
Jul 09 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 09 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, David Carson, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 3, 2021. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 22, 2021.
Jul 14 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, A. Pender Makin
Blanket Consent
Sep 03 2021Brief of petitioners David Carson, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amici curiae of World Faith Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Michael W. McConnell filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2021Brief amici curiae of Liberty Justice Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2021Brief amici curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2021Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition of Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Charles L. Glenn filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Members of the United States Senate filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Ashley R. Berner filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, et al., filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Protect the First Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Freedom X filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Advancing American Freedom filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Partnership for Inner-City Education, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pioneer Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Independent Women's Law Center and Independent Women's Forum filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Concerned Women for America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Innovative Schools filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of EdChoice, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of The Southern Christian Leadership Conference - Memphis Chapter, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Arkansas, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Hillsdale College filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs (COLPA), et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Stanley M. Herzog Charitable Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Georgia Goal Scholarship Program, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, December 8, 2021.
Sep 27 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit.
Oct 04 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer also received is one envelope with the Joint Appendix.
Oct 08 2021The record from the U.S.D.C. District Court of Maine is electronic and located on Pacer.
Oct 22 2021Brief of respondent A. Pender Makin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of State of Vermont filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021CIRCULATED
Oct 29 2021Brief amici curiae of National School Boards Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Brief amici curiae of National Education Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Virginia, California, Delaware, Massachusetts, Minnesota, New Mexico, New York, Oregon, Washington, and the District of Columbia filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Education and Constitutional Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Public Funds Public Schools filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 29 2021Brief amici curiae of The Freedom From Religion Foundation and Center for Inquiry filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Atheists, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Advancement Project, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Religious and Civil-Rights Organizations, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Maine School Management Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 08 2021Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Nov 22 2021Reply of petitioners David Carson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2021Argued. For petitioners: Michael Bindas, Seattle, Wash. For respondent: Christopher C. Taub, Chief Deputy Attorney General, Augusta, Me.; and Malcolm L. Stewart, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
Jan 28 2022Letter from the Commonwealth of Virginia to the Court notifying the Court of the Commonwealth’s change in position filed (Revised letter of 2/18/2022). (Distributed)
Main Document
Jun 21 2022Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Thomas, Alito, Gorsuch, Kavanaugh, and Barrett, JJ., joined. Breyer, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Kagan, J., joined, and in which Sotomayor, J., joined as to all but Part I–B. Sotomayor, J., filed a dissenting opinion.
Jul 25 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Eugene Bindas
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
600 University Street
Suite 1730
Seattle, WA 98101

mbindas@ij.org
2069571300
Party name: David Carson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Ann Forster
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
6 State House Station
Augusta, ME 04333

sarah.forster@maine.gov
2076268866
Party name: A. Pender Makin
Other
Geoffrey Thomas Blackwell
    Counsel of Record
American Atheists, Inc.
1201 S. Courthouse Rd.
#425
Arlington, VA 22204

legal@atheists.org
(908) 276-7300
Party name: American Atheists, Inc.
David Boies
    Counsel of Record
Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
55 Hudson Yards
New York, NY 10001

dboies@bsfllp.com
(914) 749-8200
Party name: Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc.
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
501-682-6302
Party name: The States of Arkansas, Alabama, Arizona, Georgia, Florida, Idaho, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, New Hampshire, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
501-682-6302
Party name: States of Arkansas, Alabama, Arizona, Georgia, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia
Michael Alan Brown
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough LLP
100 S. Charles Street
Suite 1600
Baltimore, MD 21201

mike.brown@nelsonmullins.com
(443) 392-9401
Party name: Education and Constitutional Law Scholars
Arthur Joseph Burke
    Counsel of Record
Davis Polk & Wardell LLP
450 Lexington Ave
New York, NY 10017

arthur.burke@davispolk.com
212-450-4352
Party name: The Southern Christian Leadership Conference - Memphis Chapter, Rev. Vernon Horner, Deborah L. Womack, Deacon George Womack, and Rev. Steven Joiner
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Jewish Coalition of Religious Liberty
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

atcaso@ccg1776.com
916-601-1916
Party name: Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Concerned Women for America, et al.
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: National Legal Foundation, et al.
Kimberlee Wood Colby
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society
8001 Braddock Rd., Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22151

kcolby@clsnet.org
703-894-1087
Party name: Christian Legal Society, et al.,
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Cause of Action Institute
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

cynthia.crawford@causeofaction.org
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation; Yes. Every Kid.
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

ccrawford@afphq.org
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation and yes. every kid.
Joshua Daniel Davey
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
301 S. College Street
34th Floor
Charlotte, NC 28202

jdavey@mcguirewoods.com
(704) 916-1503
Party name: Members of the United States Senate
Elizabeth Napier Dewar
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

bessie.dewar@mass.gov
617-963-2204
Party name: Massachusetts, California, Delaware, Minnesota, New Mexico, New York, Oregon, Washington, and the District of Columbia
Dominic Emil Draye
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig LLP
2101 L Street, NW
Washington, DC 20037

drayed@gtlaw.com
(202) 331-3168
Party name: Professor Ashley R. Berner
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3342621245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Patrick C Elliott
    Counsel of Record
Freedom From Religion Foundation
PO BOX 750
Madison, WI 53701

pelliott@ffrf.org
6082568900
Party name: The Freedom From Religion Foundation and Center for Inquiry
Andrew Nathan Ferguson
    Counsel of Record
Virginia Office of the Attorney General
202 North 9th St.
Richmond, VA 23219

AFerguson@oag.state.va.us
8047867704
Party name: Virginia
Michael Crow Gilleran
    Counsel of Record
FisherBroyles, LLP
470 Atlantic Avenue
Boston, MA 02210

michael.gilleran@fisherbroyles.com
3392371384
Party name: Pioneer Institute
Richard Shawn Gunnarson
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
Key Bank Tower
36 South State Street, Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
801-323-5907
Party name: The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, et al.
Sarah Michelle Harris
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

sharris@wc.com
202-434-5000
Party name: Professor Charles L. Glenn
Eric Robert Herlan
    Counsel of Record
Drummond Woodsum
84 Marginal Way, Suite 600
Portland, ME 04101-2480

erherlan@dwmlaw.com
207-772-1941
Party name: Maine School Management Association, Maine School Superintendents Association, Maine School Board Assocation
Leslie Davis Hiner
    Counsel of Record
EdChoice
111 Monument Circle, Suite 2650
lndianapolis, IN 46204

leslie@edchoice.org
317-681-0745
Party name: EdChoice and Maine Policy Institute
James L. Hirsen
    Counsel of Record
Suite 101
505 S. Villa Real Drive
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

james@jameshirsen.com
(714) 283-8880
Party name: World Faith Foundation and Institute for Faith and Family in Support
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2100 McKinney Avenue
Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75201

aho@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3100
Party name: Innovative Schools
Kirk Christopher Jenkins
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
Three Embarcadero Center
10th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

kirk.jenkins@arnoldporter.com
4154713100
Party name: Advancement Project, Journey for Justice Alliance, Alliance for Educational Justice, Gsa Network
Mitchell Keiter
    Counsel of Record
Keiter Appellate Law
The Beverly Hills Law Building, 424 South Beverly Drive
Beverly Hills, CA 90212

mitchell.keiter@gmail.com
13105538533
Party name: Freedom X
James Patrick Kelly III
    Counsel of Record
Solidarity Ctr./Law & Justice
3740 Davinci Court
Suite 375
Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

jamespkellyiii@gmail.com
678-231-1209
Party name: Georgia Goal Scholarship Program, Inc.
Nathan Lewin
    Counsel of Record
Lewin & Lewin, LLP
888 17th St. NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

nat@lewinlewin.com
2028281000
Party name: National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs (COLPA)
Jonathan Philip Lienhard
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

jlienhard@holtzmanvogel.com
15403418808
Party name: The Stanley M. Herzog Charitable Foundation
Alexander J. Luchenitser
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

luchenitser@au.org
202-466-7306
Party name: Religious and Civil-Rights Organizations (Americans United for Separation of Church and State, et al.)
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: Brief for Council of Islamic Schools in North America, Partnership for Inner-City Education, and Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: Partnership for Inner-City Education, Council of Islamic Schools in North America, and National Council of Young Israel
Russell Charles MenyhartTaft Stettinius & Hollister
0ne lndiana Square. Ste 3500
lndianapolis, IN 46204

rmenyhart@taftlaw.com
3177139423
Party name: EdChoice and Maine Policy Institute
Francisco Maria Negron Jr.
    Counsel of Record
National School Boards Association
1680 Duke St., FL 2
Alexandria, VA 22314

fnegron@nsba.org
7038386722
Party name: National School Boards Association et al.
L. Martin Nussbaum
    Counsel of Record
Nussbaum Speir Gleason PLLC
2 N. Cascade Avenue
Suite 1430
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

martin@nussbaumspeir.com
(719) 428-1919
Party name: Professor Michael W. McConnell
Larry James Obhof Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Shumaker, Loop and Kendrick LLP
2400 Huntington Center
41 South High Street
Columbus, OH 43215

lobhof@shumaker.com
(614) 628-4433
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Elizabeth B. PrelogarSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

erassbach@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Ramya Ravindran
    Counsel of Record
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
805 15th Street, N.W. Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

rravindran@bredhoff.com
2028422600
Party name: National Education Association, et al.
Paul Joseph Ray
    Counsel of Record
750 17th St. Northwest, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20006

pjr@beaufortstrategies.com
19102809652
Party name: Hillsdale College
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Protect the First Foundation
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Matthew Jared Sheehan
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

matt@advancingamericanfreedom.com
(570) 294-1039
Party name: Advancing American Freedom
Richard A. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

rsimpson@wiley.law
202-719-7314
Party name: Public Funds Public Schools
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
141 W. Jackson St.
Suite 1065
Chicago, IL 60604

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Gordon Dwyer Todd
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 22305

gtodd@sidley.com
(202) 736-8760
Party name: Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America
Edward Mark Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
2300 N Street, NW
Suite 643A
Washington, DC 20037

emwenger@HoltzmanVogel.com
2027378808
Party name: Independent Women's Law Center and Independent Women's Forum

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543