Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-107
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-107
Title:Cedar Point Nursery, et al., Petitioners
v.
Victoria Hassid, et al.
Docketed:August 3, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-16321)
   Decision Date:May 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 29, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 06 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Cedar Point Nursery, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 2, 2020 to October 2, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 2, 2020.
Aug 27 2020Brief amicus curiae of California Farm Bureau Federation filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain DocumentProof of Service
Aug 31 2020Brief amicus curiae of Pelican Institute for Public Policy filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2020Brief amici curiae of State of Oklahoma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2020Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Farm Bureau Federation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2020Brief of respondents Victoria Hassid, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 15 2020Reply of petitioners Cedar Point Nursery, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 21 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/6/2020.
Nov 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/13/2020.
Nov 13 2020Petition GRANTED.
Nov 24 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Cedar Point Nursery, et al.
Main Document
Dec 02 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Cedar Point Nursery, et al.
Blanket Consent
Dec 07 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Dec 28 2020Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Dec 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including December 31, 2020.
Dec 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of Pelican Institute for Public Policy filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 31 2020Brief of petitioners Cedar Point Nursery, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 31 2020Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2021Amicus brief of New England Legal Foundation not accepted for filing. (January 06, 2021)
Jan 06 2021Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 06 2021Brief amicus curiae of California Farm Bureau Federation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2021Brief amici curiae of Western Growers Association; California Fresh Fruit Association; Grower-Shipper Association of Santa Barbara and San Luis Obispo Counties; and Ventura County Agricultural Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 06 2021Amicus brief of Mountain States Legal Foundation not accepted for filing. (February 04, 2021 - Corrected brief filed.)
Jan 06 2021Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Main Document
Jan 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2021Brief amici curiae of National Association of Counties, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2021Brief amici curiae of State of Oklahoma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Farm Bureau Federation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2021Motion for an extension of time filed by responents.
Main Document
Jan 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file respondents' brief on the merits is granted and the time is extended to and including February 5, 2021.
Feb 01 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 22, 2021.
Feb 04 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Feb 04 2021Record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Feb 05 2021Brief of respondents Victoria Hassid, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 10 2021Brief amici curiae of National Employment Law Project, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2021Brief amici curiae of United Food and Commercial Workers Western States Council and Teamsters Joint Council 7 filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 11 2021Amicus brief of Property Law Professors not accepted for filing. (February 19, 2021)
Feb 11 2021Brief amici curiae of Property Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2021Amicus brief of United Food and Commercial Workers Western States Council and Teamsters Joint Council 7 not accepted for filing. (March 10, 2021)
Feb 12 2021Letter from the Acting Solicitor General notifying the Court of the United States' change in position from that presented in its amicus curiae brief filed on January 7, 2021 filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2021Brief amici curiae of Legal Historians filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of Service Employees International Union filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of United Farm Workers of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2021Brief amici curiae of California Rural Legal Assistance, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of Senators Sheldon Whitehouse, Jeff Merkley, Richard Blumenthal, Cory Booker, and Alex Padilla filed. (Corrected brief to be filed)
Feb 12 2021Brief amici curiae of Senators Sheldon Whitehouse, et al. filed (Feb. 22, 2021).
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 12 2021Brief amici curiae of International Lawyers Assisting Workers Network (ILAW), et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 12 2021Brief amici curiae of Commonwealth of Virginia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2021Brief amici curiae of Local Governments filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021CIRCULATED.
Mar 05 2021Reply of petitioners Cedar Point Nursery, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2021Argued. For petitioners: Joshua P. Thompson, Sacramento, Cal. For respondents: Michael J. Mongan, Solicitor General, San Francisco, Cal.
Jun 23 2021Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Thomas, Alito, Gorsuch, Kavanaugh, and Barrett, JJ., joined. Kavanaugh, J., filed a concurring opinion. Breyer, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Sotomayor and Kagan, JJ., joined.
Jul 26 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Joshua Paul Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

jthompson@pacificlegal.org
9164197111
Party name: Cedar Point Nursery, et al.
Wencong FaPacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

wfa@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Cedar Point Nursery, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joshua Patashnik
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

josh.patashnik@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3896
Party name: Victoria Hassid, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Paul J. Beard II
    Counsel of Record
FisherBroyles LLP
4470 W. Sunset Blvd.
Suite 93165
Los Angeles, CA 90027

paul.beard@fisherbroyles.com
818-216-3988
Party name: American Farm Bureau Federation
Michael M. Berger
    Counsel of Record
MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, LLP
2049 Century Park East
Suite 1700
Los Angeles, CA 90067

mmberger@manatt.com
(310) 312-4185
Party name: Western Growers Association; California Fresh Fruit Association; Grower-Shipper Association of Santa Barbara and San Luis Obispo Counties; and Ventura County Agricultural Association
Carl Gale Borden
    Counsel of Record
2600 River Plaza Dr
Sacramento, CA 95833

cborden@cfbf.com
9165615659
Party name: California Farm Bureau Federation
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Bryan Gregg Cleveland
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Attorney General's Office
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

bryan.cleveland@oag.ok.gov
(405) 521-3921
Party name: State of Oklahoma, et al.
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

ccrawford@afphq.org
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Leon Dayan
    Counsel of Record
Bredhoff & Kaiser, PLLC
805 15th Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

ldayan@bredhoff.com
202-842-2600
Party name: Service Employees International Union
John D. Echeverria
    Counsel of Record
Vermont Law School
164 Chelsea Street
P.O Box 96
South Royalton, VT 05068

jecheverria@vermontlaw.edu
8028311386
Party name: Property Law Professors
Matthew James Ginsburg
    Counsel of Record
American Fed. of Labor and Congress of Industrial
815 16th St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

mginsburg@aflcio.org
202-637-5397
Party name: American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Sarah Elizabeth Roy Harbison
    Counsel of Record
Pelican Instititue for Public Policy
400 Poydras St., Suite 900
New Orleans, LA 70130

sarah@pelicaninstitute.org
5049528016
Party name: Pelican Institute for Public Policy
Toby Jay Heytens
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

SolicitorGeneral@oag.state.va.us
(804) 786-7240
Party name: Commonwealth of Virginia, et al.
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
1700 K Street, NW, Fifth Floor
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@wsgr.com
(202) 973-8888
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Matthew Littleton
    Counsel of Record
Donahue, Goldberg, Weaver & Littleton
1008 Pennsylvania Ave SE
Washington, DC 20003

matt@donahuegoldberg.com
2026836895
Party name: National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, U.S. Conference of Mayors, International City/County Management Association, International Municipal Lawyers Association, Government Finance Officers Association
Katharine Minkel Mapes
    Counsel of Record
Spiegel & McDiarmid LLP
1875 Eye Street, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20006

Katharine.mapes@spiegelmcd.com
202-879-4000
Party name: Legal Historians
Mario Martinez
    Counsel of Record
Martinez Aguilasocho & Lynch, A Professional Law Corporation
P.O. Box 1998
Bakersfield, CA 93303

mmartinez@farmworkerlaw.com
661-859-1174
Party name: United Farm Workers of America
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Veronica Melendez Lopez
    Counsel of Record
California Rural Legal Assistance Foundation
2210 K Street, Suite 201
Sacramento, CA 95816

vmelendez@crlaf.org
(916) 446-7904
Party name: California Rural Legal Assistance, Inc., California Rural Legal Assistance Foundation, Farmworker Justice, and California Catholic Conference
Jonathan B. Miller
    Counsel of Record
Public Rights Project
4096 Piedmont Avenue, #149
Oakland, CA 94612

jon@publicrightsproject.org
6468316113
Party name: Local Governments
Jeanne Ellen Mirer
    Counsel of Record
1 Whitehall Street, 16th Floor
New York, NY 10004

jmirer@mmsjlaw.com
2122312235
Party name: International Lawyers Assisting Workers Network (ILAW), International Commission For Labor Rights (ICLR), Global Labor Justice-International Labor Rights Forum (GLJ-ILR) and Cornell Labor Law Clinic
John Pagliaro
    Counsel of Record
The New England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111

johnpagliaro@nelfonline.org
617-695-3660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
Jeffrey Hallett Redfern
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

jredfern@ij.org
6123081084
Party name: Institute for Justice
Glenn Ellis Rothner
    Counsel of Record
Rothner, Segall and Greenstone
510 South Marengo Avenue
Pasadena, CA 91101

grothner@rsglabor.com
(626) 796-7555
Party name: Senators Sheldon Whitehouse, Jeff Merkley, Richard Blumenthal, Cory Booker, and Alex Padilla
Catherine Kiley Ruckelshaus
    Counsel of Record
National Employment Law Project
90 Broad Street
Suite 1100
New York, NY 10004

cruckelshaus@nelp.org
6466938221
Party name: National Employment Law Project, et al.
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
208 South LaSalle Street, Suite 1690
Chicago, IL 60604

jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Robert H. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert
1003 Bishop Street
1600 Pauahi Tower
Honolulu, HI 96813-0000

rht@hawaiilawyer.com
808-531-8031
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Henry M. Willis
    Counsel of Record
Schwartz, Steinsapir, Dohrmann & Sommers
6300 Wilshire Blvd.
Suite 2000
Los Angeles, CA 90048

hmw@ssdslaw.com
3236554700
Party name: United Food and Commercial Workers Western States Council and Teamsters Joint Council 7
Cristen Alice Wohlgemuth
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 S. Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

cristen@mslegal.org
3032922021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543