Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1066
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1066
Title:Ashlyn Hoggard, Petitioner
v.
Ron Rhodes, et al.
Docketed:February 4, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3016)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 28 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 8, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Ashlyn Hoggard.
Blanket Consent
Mar 02 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Ron Rhodes, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Mar 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 8, 2021 to April 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 7, 2021.
Mar 04 2021Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights in Education filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for American Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Speech First, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 12 2021Brief amici curiae of Young Americans for Liberty et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 07 2021Brief of respondents Ron Rhodes, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Ashlyn Hoggard
Attorneys for Respondents
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Ron Rhodes, et al.
Other
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Young Americans for Liberty et al.
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

will@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Speech First, Inc.
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
560 W. Crossville Rd.
Suite 104
Roswell, GA 30075-7509

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Mark P. Meuser
    Counsel of Record
Dhillon Law Group
177 Post St., Suite 700
San Francisco, CA 94108

mmeuser@dhillonlaw.com
4155772850
Party name: Center for American Liberty
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute
Darpana M. Sheth
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Individual Rights in Education
700 Pennsylvania Ave. SE
Washington, DC 20003

darpana.sheth@thefire.org
2157173473
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights in Education

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543