Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-103
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-103
Title:Stephen E. Stockman, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 3, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-20780)
   Decision Date:January 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:March 2, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 05 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 12 2020Brief amici curiae of American Target Advertising, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Public Advocate of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Stephen Stockman
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Mark J. Fitzgibbons
    Counsel of Record
American Target Advertising
9625 Surveyor Court
Suite 400
Manassas, VA 20110

mfitzgibbons@americantarget.com
7033927676
Party name: American Target Advertising, Inc., et al.
Joseph W. Miller
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Joseph Miller
P.O. Box 83440
Fairbanks, AK 99708

joe@joemiller.us
9074518559
Party name: Public Advocate of the United States, et al.
John Michael Reeves Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Reeves Law, LLC
3703 Watson Rd.
St. Louis, MO 63109

reeves@reeveslawstl.com
3147756985
Party name: Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543