Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A1053
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A1053
Title:United States Army Corps of Engineers, et al., Applicants
v.
Northern Plains Resource Council, et al.
Docketed:June 15, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-35412; 20-35414; 20-35415)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 15 2020Application (19A1053) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Proof of ServiceLower Court Orders/OpinionsMain Document
Jun 16 2020Response to application (19A1053) requested by Justice Kagan, due Monday, June 29, by noon ET.
Jun 17 2020Response to application from respondents TC Energy Corporation, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 17 2020Response to application from respondents American Gas Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 17 2020Response of TC Energy Corporation and TransCanada Keystone Pipeline LP to application not accepted for filing. (June 17, 2020)
Jun 17 2020Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief and Amicus Brief of State of West Virginia, Texas, and 16 Other States not accepted for filing. (June 18, 2020)
Jun 23 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by West Virginia, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jun 26 2020Motion for Leave to File in Compliance with Rule 33.2 and to File Amicus Brief of NextEra Energy, Inc. not accepted for filing. (June 29, 2020)
Jun 29 2020Response to application from respondents Northern Plains Resource Council, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 29 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by NextEra Energy, Inc.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jul 02 2020Reply of applicants United States Army Corps of Engineers, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Jul 06 2020The application for stay presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court is granted in part and denied in part. The district court’s May 11, 2020 order granting partial vacatur and an injunction is stayed, except as it applies to the Keystone XL pipeline, pending disposition of the appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is timely sought. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: US Corps of Army Engineers, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7202
Party name: AMERICAN GAS ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PETROLEUM INSTITUTE, ASSOCIATION OF OIL PIPE LINES, INTERSTATE NATURAL GAS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, AND NATIONAL RURAL ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE ASSOCIATION
Joseph Robert Guerra
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

jguerra@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: TC Energy Corporation and TransCanada Keystone Pipeline LP
Cecilia Danielle Segal
    Counsel of Record
Natural Resources Defense Council
111 Sutter Street, 21st Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

csegal@nrdc.org
4158756100
Party name: Northern Plains Resource Council, Bold Alliance, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Center for Biological Diversity, and Friends of the Earth
Other
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
1900 Kanawha Blvd E, Bldg 1 Rm 26E
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: State of West Virginia, Texas, and 16 Other States
Theodore B. Olson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

tolson@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8668
Party name: NextEra Energy, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543