Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-765
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-765
Title:Michael Faust, Director, Arizona Department of Child Safety, Petitioner
v.
B. K., By Her Next Friend Margaret Tinsley, et al.
Docketed:December 16, 2019
Linked with 19A364
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-17502)
   Decision Date:April 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 15, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2019Application (19A364) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 13, 2019 to November 13, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 01 2019Application (19A364) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 13, 2019.
Oct 31 2019Application (19A364) to extend further the time from November 13, 2019 to December 12, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Oct 31 2019Application of Michael Faust for a further extension of time not accepted for filing. (November 25, 2019 -- Duplicate submission)
Nov 04 2019Application (19A364) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 12, 2019.
Dec 12 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 15, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 15, 2020 to February 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 06 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Michael Faust.
Blanket Consent
Jan 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 14, 2020.
Jan 10 2020Brief amici curiae of State of Missouri, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of Secretaries' Innovation Group filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of Childhelp, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2020Brief of respondents B.K., by her next friend Margaret Tinsley,et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 04 2020Reply of petitioner Michael Faust filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 23 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 389-5000
Party name: Michael Faust
Attorneys for Respondents
Joel W. Nomkin
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
2901 North Central Avenue, Suite 2000
Phoenix, AZ 85012

jnomkin@perkinscoie.com
602.351.8185
Party name: B.K., by her next friend Margaret Tinsley
Other
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Bursch Law PLLC
9339 Cherry Valley SE, #78
Caledonia, MI 49316

jbursch@burschlaw.com
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Secretaries' Innovation Group
Dominic Emil Draye
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig LLP
2101 L Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

drayed@gtlaw.com
2023313168
Party name: Childhelp, Inc.
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Supreme Court Building, 207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: State of Missouri

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543