Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-255
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-255
Title:Thomas More Law Center, Petitioner
v.
Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California
Docketed:August 26, 2019
Linked with 18A1268
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-56855, 16-56902)
   Decision Date:September 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 29, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 03 2019Application (18A1268) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 27, 2019 to August 26, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Jun 05 2019Application (18A1268) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 26, 2019.
Aug 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Thomas More Law Center.
Blanket Consent
Sep 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 25, 2019 to October 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 25, 2019.
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Proposition 8 Legal Defense Fund filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Hispanic Leadership Fund filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Philanthropy Roundtable, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of 24 Family Policy Organizations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Free Speech Coalition, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation, Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Foundation for Michigan Freedom and Texas Public Policy Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2019 to November 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 25, 2019.
Nov 25 2019Brief of respondent Xavier Becerra in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2019Reply of petitioner Thomas More Law Center filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 21 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.
Feb 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Nov 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner Thomas More Law Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 09 2020Supplemental brief of respondent Xavier Becerra filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 08 2021Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-251 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jan 08 2021Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-251. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-251. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Mar 12 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 26, 2021. VIDED.
Mar 15 2021Record requested.
Mar 15 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Mar 30 2021CIRCULATED
Apr 26 2021Argued. For petitioners: Derek L. Shaffer, Washington, D. C. For United States, as amicus curiae: Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Acting Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Aimee A. Feinberg, Deputy Solicitor General, Sacramento, Cal. VIDED.
Jul 01 2021Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, except as to Part II– B–1. Kavanaugh and Barrett, JJ., joined that opinion in full, Alito and Gorsuch, JJ., joined except as to Part II–B–1, and Thomas, J., joined except as to Parts II–B–1 and III–B. Thomas, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the judgment. Alito, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the judgment, in which Gorsuch, J., joined. Sotomayor, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer and Kagan, JJ., joined. VIDED.
Aug 02 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Thomas More Law Center
Attorneys for Respondent
Aimee Athena Feinberg
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

Aimee.Feinberg@doj.ca.gov
916-210-6003
Party name: Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Eric S. Baxter
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

ebaxter@becketlaw.org
202-955-0095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Caleb P. Burns
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

cburns@wileyrein.com
202-719-7000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and The U.S. Chamber of Commerce Foundation
Allen Joseph Dickerson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
124 S. West Street
Suite 201
Alexandria, VA 22314

adickerson@ifs.org
7038946846
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Randolph Scott Elf
    Counsel of Record
Post Office Box 525
Lakewood, NY 14750

ForEFilingOnly@gmail.com
2024232122
Party name: Randy Elf
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Hispanic Leadership Fund
Margaret Ann Little
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St. NW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

peggy.little@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
2028695212
Party name: The New Civil Liberties Alliance
Margaret Ann Little
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St. NW
Suite450
Washington, DC 20036

peggy.little@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
2028695210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Anita Yvonne Milanovich
    Counsel of Record
Milanovich Law, PLLC
100 E Broadway Street, The Berkeley Room
Butte, MT 59701

aymilanovich@milanovichlaw.com
4065896856
Party name: 24 Family Policy Organizations
Matthew Robert Miller
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

mmiller@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Kaylan Lytle Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
32 E. Washington, Suite 1675
Indianapolis,, IN 46204

kphillips@publicinterestlegal.org
3172035599
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation, Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Foundation for Michigan Freedom and Texas Public Policy Foundation
Andrew P. Pugno
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Andrew P. Pugno
8261 Greenback Lane
Suite 200
Fair Oaks, CA 95628-2533

andrew@pugnolaw.com
9166083065
Party name: Proposition 8 Legal Defense Fund
Alexander Lyman Reid
    Counsel of Record
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

alexander.reid@morganlewis.com
(202) 739-3000
Party name: Philanthropy Roundtable, Independent Women's Forum, and People United for Privacy Foundation
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, D.C., DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
202-546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute
Paul Michael Sherman
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

psherman@ij.org
7036829320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Jeremy Brennan Talcott
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

jtalcott@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, Southeastern Legal Foundation, and Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Herbert William Titus
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

htitus@cox.net
7033565070
Party name: Free Speech Coalition, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543