Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-253
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-253
Title:Straight Path IP Group, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Apple Inc., et al.
Docketed:August 27, 2019
Linked with 18A1266
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1491, 2018-1492)
   Decision Date:January 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:March 28, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 31 2019Application (18A1266) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 26, 2019 to August 23, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 06 2019Application (18A1266) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 23, 2019.
Aug 23 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 26, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceAppendix
Aug 28 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, SPIP Litigation Group, LLC.
Blanket Consent
Sep 04 2019Waiver of right of respondent Apple Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 05 2019Waiver of right of respondent Cisco Systems, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 18 2019Response Requested. (Due October 18, 2019)
Oct 17 2019Brief of respondent Cisco Systems, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2019Brief of respondent Apple Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Respondent Apple, Inc. Rule 29.6 Corporate Disclosure Statement received.
Main Document
Oct 28 2019Reply of petitioner SPIP Litigation Group, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 18 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nathan Lewin
    Counsel of Record
Lewin & Lewin, LLP
888 17th St. NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

nat@lewinlewin.com
2028281000
Party name: SPIP Litigation Group, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
John M. Desmarais
    Counsel of Record
Desmarais LLP
230 Park Avenue
Floor 26
New York, NY 10169

jdesmarais@desmaraisllp.com
212-351-3400
Party name: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: Apple Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543