Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1299
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1299
Title:The Chamberlain Group, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Techtronic Industries Co., et al.
Docketed:May 19, 2020
Linked with 19A956
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2103, 2018-2228)
   Decision Date:August 21, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 17, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 27 2020Application (19A956) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 16, 2020 to May 15, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Application (19A956) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 15, 2020.
May 15 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 18, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 19 2020Waiver of right of respondent Techtronic Industries, Co. Ltd., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
Jun 08 2020Response Requested. (Due July 8, 2020)
Jun 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 8, 2020 to August 7, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 7, 2020.
Jul 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of High 5 Games, LLC filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2020Brief amici curiae of The Honorable Randall R. Rader (ret.) and ChargePoint, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 07 2020Brief of respondents Techtronic Industries, Co. Ltd., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from August 26, 2020 to September 2, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 18 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until September 2, 2020 granted.
Sep 01 2020Reply of petitioner The Chamberlain Group, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: The Chamberlain Group, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
William Robert Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1000 Louisiana Street
Suite 4000
Houston, TX 77002

william.peterson@morganlewis.com
713-890-5188
Party name: Techtronic Industries, Co. Ltd., et al.
Other
Jeremy Cooper Doerre
    Counsel of Record
Tillman Wright, PLLC
3440 Toringdon Way, Suite 310
Charlotte, NC 28277

jdoerre@ti-law.com
7042484883
Party name: The Honorable Randall R. Rader (ret.) and ChargePoint, Inc.
Robert Collins Ryan
    Counsel of Record
Holland Hart LLP
4551 South Kietcke Lane
Reno, NV 89511

rcryan@hollandhart.com
775-247-8803
Party name: High 5 Games, LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543