Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1273
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1273
Title:Assassination Archives and Research Center, Petitioner
v.
Central Intelligence Agency
Docketed:May 8, 2020
Linked with 19A1010
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5280)
   Decision Date:October 11, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 10, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 09 2020Application (19A1010) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 9, 2020 to May 8, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 13 2020Application (19A1010) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 8, 2020.
Apr 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 8, 2020)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 08 2020Waiver of right of respondent Central Intelligence Agency to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jul 16 2020Response Requested. (Due August 17, 2020)
Jul 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 17, 2020 to September 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 16, 2020.
Jul 22 2020Response of Assassination Archives and Research Center to motion submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel S. Alcorn
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
1335 Ballantrae Lane
McLean, VA 22101

dalcorn@rcn.com
703-442-0704
Party name: Assassination Archives and Research Center
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Central Intelligence Agency

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543