Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1186
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1186
Title:Joshua Baker, Director, South Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Petitioner
v.
Planned Parenthood South Atlantic, et al.
Docketed:March 30, 2020
Linked with 19A752
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2133)
   Decision Date:October 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2020Application (19A752) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 27, 2020 to March 27, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 08 2020Application (19A752) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 27, 2020.
Mar 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 29, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Joshua Baker
Blanket Consent
Apr 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 29, 2020 to May 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 29, 2020.
Apr 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Nebraska, Indiana, and 17 Other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2020Brief amici curiae of 137 Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Family Policy Councils filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2020Brief amici curiae of 86 Current and 2 Former South Carolina Legislators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Apr 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of Americans United for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 29, 2020 to June 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 29, 2020.
Jun 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 29, 2020 to July 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 29, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Bursch Law PLLC
9339 Cherry Valley SE, #78
Caledonia, MI 49316

jbursch@burschlaw.com
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Joshua Baker
Attorneys for Respondents
Alice Clapman
    Counsel of Record
Planned Parenthood Federation of America
1110 Vermont Ave., NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20005

alice.clapman@ppfa.org
2029734862
Party name: Planned Parenthood South Atlantic, et al.
Other
Steven Henry Aden
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
1150 Connecticut Ave. NW, Suite 500
Washington, DC 22036

Steven.Aden@aul.org
202-741-4917
Party name: Americans United for Life
James A. Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Nebraska Attorney General's Office
2115 State Capitol
Lincoln, NE 68509

jim.campbell@nebraska.gov
(402) 471-2682
Party name: Nebraska, Indiana, and 17 Other States
Tim Newton
    Counsel of Record
Murphy and Grantland, P.A.
4406-B Forest Drive
Columbia, SC 29206

tnewton@murphygrantland.com
803-782-4100
Party name: 86 Current and 2 Former South Carolina Legislators
Andrew C. Nichols
    Counsel of Record
Charis Lex P.C.
4250 N. Fairfax Dr.
Suite 600
Arlington, VA 22203

anichols@charislex.com
2022825000
Party name: 137 Members of Congress
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2022485407
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Randall L. Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Independence Law Center
23 N. Front Street, First Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

rwenger@indlawcenter.org
717-657-4990
Party name: Family Policy Councils

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543