Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1123
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1123
Title:Leo Lech, et al., Petitioners
v.
Chief John A. Jackson, et al.
Docketed:March 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1051)
   Decision Date:October 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 27, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 11 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2020 to June 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 3, 2020.
Apr 14 2020Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 15 2020Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute and Professor Ilya Somin filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of Onwers' Counsel of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioners.
Main Document
Jun 03 2020Brief of respondents The City of Greenwood Village, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Jun 08 2020Reply of petitioners Leo Lech, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 29 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey Hallett Redfern
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

jredfern@ij.org
6123081084
Party name: Leo Lech, et al.
Other
Mark Miller
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
4440 PGA Blvd.
Suite 307
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

mmiller@pacificlegal.org
5616915000
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute and Professor Ilya Somin
Robert H. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert
1003 Bishop Street
1600 Pauahi Tower
Honolulu, HI 96813-0000

rht@hawaiilawyer.com
808-531-8031
Party name: Onwers' Counsel of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543