Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-93
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-93
Title:Donald Zimmerman, Petitioner
v.
City of Austin, Texas
Docketed:July 20, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-51366)
   Decision Date:February 1, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 18, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 17 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2018Waiver of right of respondent City of Austin, Texas to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 14 2018Response Requested. (Due September 13, 2018)
Aug 16 2018Brief amici curiae of Public Policy Legal Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2018Brief of City of Austin, Texas in opposition not accepted for filing. (September 13, 2018) (Corrected filing to be submitted)
Sep 13 2018Brief of respondent City of Austin, Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2018Reply of petitioner Donald Zimmerman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 25 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 01 2018Rescheduled.
Nov 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 08 2018Rescheduled.
Nov 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 15 2018Rescheduled.
Nov 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Nov 29 2018Rescheduled.
Dec 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.
Dec 10 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jerad Wayne Najvar
    Counsel of Record
Najvar Law Firm, PLLC
2180 North Loop West
Suite 255
Houston, TX 77018

jerad@najvarlaw.com
(281) 404-4696
Party name: Donald Zimmerman
Attorneys for Respondent
Renea Hicks
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Max Renea Hicks
P.O. Box 303187
Austin, TX 78703

rhicks@renea-hicks.com
(512) 480-8231
Party name: City of Austin, Texas
Other
Barnaby W. Zall
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Barnaby Zall
685 Spring St. #314
Friday Harbor, WA 98250

bzall@aol.com
360-378-6600
Party name: Public Policy Legal Institute, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543