Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-912
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-912
Title:AmeriCare MedServices, Inc., Petitioner
v.
City of Anaheim, California, et al.
Docketed:January 15, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-55565)
   Decision Date:August 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:October 10, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 14, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2019Corrected proof of service with respect to petition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 06 2019Waiver of right of respondents City of Anaheim, California, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 06 2019Waiver of right of respondent City of Orange to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 08 2019Waiver of right of respondent City of Fountain Valley to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 08 2019Waiver of right of respondent City of Garden Grove to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 08 2019Waiver of right of respondents City of La Habra et al to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 11 2019Waiver of right of respondent Care Ambulance Service, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 12 2019Waiver of right of respondent City of Huntington Beach to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 13 2019Waiver of right of respondent City of Buena Park to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jarod Michael Bona
    Counsel of Record
Bona Law PC
4275 Executive Square
Suite 200
La Jolla, CA 92037

jarod.bona@bonalawpc.com
8589644589
Party name: AmeriCare MedServices, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Alan Robert Burns
    Counsel of Record
Harper & Burns LLP
453 S. Glassell Street
Orange, CA 92866

arburns@harperburns.com
7147717728
Party name: City of Fountain Valley
James H. Eggart
    Counsel of Record
Woodruff, Spradlin & Smart, APC
555 Anton Blvd., Suite 1200
Costa Mesa, CA 92626

jeggart@wss-law.com
714-558-7000
Party name: City of Garden Grove
Philip Douglass Kohn
    Counsel of Record
Rutan & Tucker, LLP
611 Anton Boulevard
Suite 1400
Costa Mesa, CA 92626

pkohn@rutan.com
(714) 641-3415
Party name: City of Anaheim, California, et al.
Kendall Holmes MacVey
    Counsel of Record
Best Best & Krieger LLP
3390 University Avenue, 5th Floor
Riverside, CA 92501

kendall.macvey@bbklaw.com
951-686-1450
Party name: City of La Habra et al
Thomas Peter Pierce
    Counsel of Record
Richards, Watson & Gershon
44 Montgomery Street
Suite 3800
San Francisco, CA 94104

ppierce@rwglaw.com
4154218484
Party name: City of Buena Park
Wayne W. Winthers
    Counsel of Record
City Attorney's Office
300 East Chapman Avenue
Orange, CA 92866

wwinthers@cityoforange.org
7147445580
Party name: City of Orange
Faisal Mujtaba Zubairi
    Counsel of Record
Dorsey & Whitney, LLP
600 Anton Boulevard, Suite 2000
Costa Mesa, CA 92626

zubairi.faisal@dorsey.com
7148001461
Party name: Care Ambulance Service, Inc.
Michael E. GatesCity of Huntington Beach - Office of City Attorney
2000 Main Street
Huntington Beach, CA 92648

Michael.Gates@surfcity-hb.org
714-536-5555
Party name: City of Huntington Beach

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543