Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-767
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-767
Title:Ancient Coin Collectors Guild, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 17, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1625)
   Decision Date:August 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:October 5, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 16, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peter Karl Tompa
    Counsel of Record
Bailey & Ehrenberg PLLC
1015 18th Street, NW
Suite 204
Washington, DC 20036

pkt@becounsel.com
2023314209
Party name: Ancient Coin Collectors Guild
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543