Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-561
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-561
Title:Orus Ashby Berkley, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, et al.
Docketed:October 30, 2018
Linked with 18A599
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1042)
   Decision Date:July 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 29, 2018 to December 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 29, 2018 to December 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 28 2018Response to motion from petitioner Orus Ashby Berkley, et al. filed.
Main Document
Nov 29 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2018The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted in part; the time is extended to and including December 19, 2018, for all respondents.
Dec 06 2018Petitioners' Motion 30.4 for Review by Court of Orus Ashby Berkley, et al. not accepted for filing. (December 07, 2018 - Motion resubmitted as an application)
Dec 06 2018Application (18A599) for reconsideration of Clerk's action extending the time to file a response to the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Dec 11 2018Application (18A599) denied by The Chief Justice.
Dec 19 2018Brief of Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC in opposition not accepted for filing. (December 19, 2018) (Corrected electronic filing submitted December 19, 2018)
Dec 19 2018Brief of respondent Federal Energy Regulatory Commission in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 19 2018Brief of respondent Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018Reply of petitioners Orus Ashby Berkley, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 22 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Guy M. Harbert III
    Counsel of Record
GENTRY LOCKE
10 Franklin Road S.E.
Suite 900
Roanoke, VA 24022-0013

harbert@gentrylocke.com
540-983-9300
Party name: Orus Ashby Berkley, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Wade Wallihan Massie
    Counsel of Record
Penn, Stuart, et al.
208 East Main Street
Abingdon, VA 24210-0000

wmassie@pennstuart.com
2766234409
Party name: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Other
John W. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
The Rutherford Institute
109 Deerwood Road
Charlottesville, VA 22911

legal@rutherford.org
434-978-3888
Party name: The Rutherford Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543