Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5222
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5222
Title:Corvain T. Cooper, aka CV, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 12, 2018
Linked with 17A1286
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-7359)
   Decision Date:March 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 14 2018Application (17A1286) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 6, 2018 to July 8, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentMain Document
May 22 2018Application (17A1286) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 9, 2018.
Jul 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 13, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
Aug 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 13, 2018 to September 12, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 12, 2018.
Sep 12 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 15 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Michael Megaro
    Counsel of Record
Halscott Megaro, P.A.
1300 North Semoran Boulevard
Suite 195
Orlando, FL 32807

pmegaro@halscottmegaro.com
5163176660
Party name: Corvain Cooper
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543