Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1206
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1206
Title:Lynda Like, et al., Petitioners
v.
Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Docketed:March 18, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3115, 17-3116)
   Decision Date:October 30, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:December 13, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 13 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 09 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Owners' Counsel of America, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 17 2019Brief of respondent Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2019Reply of petitioners Lynda Like, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 28 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Owners' Counsel of America, et al. GRANTED.
May 28 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert James McNamara
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

rmcnamara@ij.org
703-682-9320
Party name: Lynda Like, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Utz Witmer
    Counsel of Record
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
1200 Liberty Ridge Drive, Suite 200
Wayne, PA 19087

Elizabeth.Witmer@saul.com
(610) 251-5062
Party name: Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Other
Robert H. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert
1003 Bishop Street
1600 Pauahi Tower
Honolulu, HI 96813-0000

rht@hawaiilawyer.com
808-531-8031
Party name: Owners' Counsel of America, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543