Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1000
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1000
Title:American Freedom Defense Initiative, et al., Petitioners
v.
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority, et al.
Docketed:January 31, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-7059)
   Decision Date:August 17, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:October 29, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2019Waiver of right of respondents Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Feb 25 2019Response Requested. (Due March 27, 2019)
Mar 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2019 to April 26, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 26, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert Joseph Muise
    Counsel of Record
American Freedom Law Center
PO Box 131098
Ann Arbor, MI 48113

rmuise@americanfreedomlawcenter.org
7346353756
Party name: American Freedom Defense Initiative, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543