Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-658
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-658
Title:Rod Blagojevich, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 3, 2017
Linked with 17A129
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3254)
   Decision Date:April 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:June 5, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 25 2017Application (17A129) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 3, 2017 to November 2, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Aug 01 2017Application (17A129) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 2, 2017.
Nov 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2017)
Nov 14 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Rod Blagojevich.
Nov 30 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2017 to January 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 30 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 3, 2018.
Dec 04 2017Brief amicus curiae of Illinois Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 04 2017Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 04 2017Brief amicus curiae of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2017Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Elected Officials, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2018 to February 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 2, 2018.
Jan 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 2, 2018 to March 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 9, 2018.
Mar 09 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 27 2018Reply of petitioner Rod Blagojevich filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kevin K. Russell
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

kr@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Rod Blagojevich
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Paul Joseph Cain
    Counsel of Record
Northern Illinois University College of Law: Zeke Giorgi Legal Clinic
401 W. State Street
Suite 600
Rockford, IL 61114

pcain@niu.edu
8159629980
Party name: Illinois Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Alan Roy Friedman
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

afriedman@kramerlevin.com
212-715-9300
Party name: Current and Former Elected Officials, et al.
Edward Dean Greim
    Counsel of Record
Graves Garrett LLC
1100 Main Street, Suite 2700
Kansas City, MO 64105

edgreim@gravesgarrett.com
816-256-3181
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Justin Matthew Sher
    Counsel of Record
Sher Tremonte, LLP
90 Broad Street, 23rd Floor
New York, NY 10004

jsher@shertremonte.com
212-202-2600
Party name: Center on the Administration of Criminal Law

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543