Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15A839
No. 15A839
Title:
Mitchell Jordan Young, Applicant
v.
Michigan
Docketed:February 9, 2016
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Michigan
  Case Nos.:(317981)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 11 2016 Application (15A839) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 26, 2016 to March 26, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Feb 9 2016 Application (15A839) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 26, 2016.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Mitchell Young 881775
Michigan Reformatory
1342 West Main Street
Ionia, MI  48846
Party name: Mitchell Jordan Young

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543